This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 23:45:18 (UTC).

MARLOWE ET AL VS GANDOLA ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/30/2017 MARLOWE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GANDOLA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1679

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MALOWE, DANIEL

MARLOWE, STEPHANIE

MARLOWE, DANIEL

Defendants

GANDOLA KINNETT, MARY

GANDOLA, MARILYN

 

Court Documents

Ruling

Ruling 08/28/2017: Hearing Time: 04:00 PM; Result: Ruling

Small Claims Trial

Small Claims Trial 06/07/2017: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: DEFENDANT'S CLAIM FILED COURTROOM ASSISTIVE LISTENING DEVICE REQUIRED; Parties Present Plaintiff: MARLOWE, DANIEL; Plaintiff: MARLOWE, STEPHANIE; Defendant: GANDOLA, MARILYN; Defendant: GANDOLA KINNETT, MARY

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2018
  • DocketImage of Archived Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • DocketExhibit(s) List - Comment: PLAINTIFFS/DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties - Comment: (Small Claims) SC-133 MAILED TO PLAINTIFFS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment Contested (CS); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: GANDOLA, MARILYN; Awarded Against: MARLOWE, DANIEL; MARLOWE, STEPHANIE; Amount; Damages: $2,145.00; Costs: $75.00; Total: $2220.00; Comment: PLAINTIFFS ARE ENTITLED TO JUDGMENT IN THEIR FAVOR AS TO DEFENDANT MARY GANDOLA KINNETT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment Contested (CS); Judgment - Non-Monetary Award: Awarded To: GANDOLA, MARILYN; GANDOLA KINNETT, MARY; Awarded Against: MARLOWE, DANIEL; MARLOWE, STEPHANIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling 08/28/2017: Hearing Time: 04:00 PM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Trial - Small Claims Trial 06/07/2017: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: DEFENDANT'S CLAIM FILED COURTROOM ASSISTIVE LISTENING DEVICE REQUIRED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • DocketProof of Service (SC-104) - Comment: DEFENDANT'S CLAIM AS TO DANIEL MARLOWE BY SUBSTITUTED SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • DocketProof of Service (SC-104) - Comment: DEFENDANT'S CLAIM AS TO STEPHANIE MARLOWE BY PERSONAL SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • Cause Of ActionCause of Action: Defendant's Claim; Type: Cross Action; Filed By: 1161811618; Filed Against: 1161811618

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • DocketCause Of Action - Cross Action Defendant's Claim; File Date: 05/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: GANDOLA, MARILYN, GANDOLA KINNETT, MARY; Unserved; Served: 05/25/2017; Served: 05/17/20172:40 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • DocketConfidential Document - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: REQUEST FOR ACCOMMODATION ASSISTIVE LISTENING DEVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • DocketClaim of Defendant - Comment: Hearing Date: 6/7/2017 Hearing Time: 9:30 AM Department/Division: 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • DocketProof of Service (SC-104) - Comment: AS TO MARY GANDOLAKINNETT BY PERSONAL SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • DocketProof of Service (SC-104) - Comment: AS TO MARILYN GANDOLA BY PERSONAL SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: MARLOWE, DANIEL, MARLOWE, STEPHANIE; Served: 04/13/20172:27 PM; Served: 04/12/20174:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant - Comment: RETURNED VIA PRO PER (M)

    Read MoreRead Less