This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/06/2018 at 10:27:00 (UTC).

MARKLEY VS CMKEZ TRUCKING ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/29/2017 MARKLEY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CMKEZ TRUCKING. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lampe, David R.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0707

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lampe, David R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARKLEY, JOHN M.

Defendants and Cross Defendants

A&F SHEEP COMPANY, INC.

NAPTON, KELLY R.

CMKEZ TRUCKING

NAPTON, KELLY

A&F SHEEP COMPANY, INC

MARKLEY, JOHN M

MARKLEY, JOHN M., Jr.

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

CMKEZ TRUCKING

A&F SHEEP COMPANY INC.

NAPTON, KELLY R

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

RYAN, ROBERT

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

MORGAN, WEYD-ANNE N.

CLIFFORD, DANIEL T

RYAN, ROBERT

ROOT, DANIEL M

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 10/02/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: RYAN, ROBERT; Cross Defendant; Attorney: RYAN, ROBERT

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 07/19/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2017
  • Cause of Action: Cross-Complaint; Type: Cross Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Case Consolidation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • Answer - Comment: TO FIRST AMENED CROSS-COMPLAINT AS TO CMKEZ TRUCKING AND KELLY R. NAPTON FOR A&F SHEEP COMPANY'S FIRST AMENED CROSS-COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • Errata - Comment: Notice of Errata to Cross-Defendant John M. Markley, Jr.' Answer to Cross-Complaint filed on October 2, 2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • Answer to Cross-Complaint - Comment: AS TO A&F SHEEP COMPANY INC. FOR CMKEZ TRUCKING & KELLY NAPTON'S CROSS-COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • Answer to Cross-Complaint - Comment: AS TO JOHN M. MARKLEY, JR. FOR CMKEZ TRUCKING & KELLY NAPTON'S CROSS-COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: re: POS pursuant to CRC rule 3.110 (Cont'd from 07/19/17) **Also has CMC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference - Case Management Conference 10/02/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: RYAN, ROBERT; Cross Defendant; Attorney: RYAN, ROBERT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 08/09/2017
  • Proof of Service - Comment: Proof of Service of A&F Sheep Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 07/19/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • Answer to Complaint - Comment: AS TO CMKEZ TRUCKING AND KELLY R. NAPTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • Proof of Service - Comment: Proof of Service of Defendant Kelly R. Napton

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • Proof of Service - Comment: Proof of Service of Defendant CMKEZ Trucking

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 7/19/2017 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division:11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: DID NOT PROVIDE ENDORSED COPY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.