This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/05/2020 at 07:16:59 (UTC).

MARKER VS MARKER, II

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 MARKER filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MARKER, II. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Ridgecrest Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Webster, Jason W.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0006

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ridgecrest Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Webster, Jason W.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MARKER, AMANDA KATHLEEN

Respondent

MARKER, RONALD SCOTT, II

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorneys - Comment: Former Attorney: ROGER I STEIN New Attorney:PRO PER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketResponse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.