This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/30/2020 at 21:33:07 (UTC).

MARIS MADIGAN CONSERVATEE

Case Summary

On 03/16/2015 MARIS MADIGAN CONSERVATEE was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Bittleston, Dawn, Knight, Alisa R., Wyatt, Ralph W., Wyatt, Ralph Wm., Seidman, David, Myers, Brett and Kendall, Andrew. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4797

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Bittleston, Dawn

Knight, Alisa R.

Wyatt, Ralph W.

Wyatt, Ralph Wm.

Seidman, David

Myers, Brett

Kendall, Andrew

 

Party Details

Petitioners

MCCREADY, VALYNE

TAZIOLI, ROBERT

ANTONGIOVANNI, MICHAEL

Not Classified By Court

FAMILY COURT SERVICES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

DAKE, STEPHEN M

 

Court Documents

Final Accounting

Final Accounting 11/22/2017: Judicial Officer: Myers, Brett; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - NOTE- 1. Supplement filed 11/16/17 missing all petitioners' signatures.; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: DAKE, STEPHEN M; Petitioner; Attorney: DAKE, STEPHEN M; Petitioner; Attorney: DAKE, STEPHEN M

Compliance Hearing

Compliance Hearing 10/31/2016: Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING SAME NOTE: 1. As of 10/24/16, the I&A & accounting have not been submitted for filing.; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: DAKE, STEPHEN M; Petitioner; Attorney: DAKE, STEPHEN M; Petitioner; Attorney: DAKE, STEPHEN M

Compliance Hearing

COMPLIANCE HEARING: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING NOTE: 1. As of 12/1/15, the Letters & $28,000 bond have not been submitted for filing.; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: DAKE, STEPHEN M; Petitioner; Attorney: DAKE, STEPHEN M; Petitioner; Attorney: DAKE, STEPHEN M

Petition for Fees

PETITION FOR FEES: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING 10/07/15 CALENDAR #2; Parties Present Petitioner: MCCREADY, VALYNE; Attorney: DAKE, STEPHEN M; Petitioner: TAZIOLI, ROBERT; Attorney: DAKE, STEPHEN M; Petitioner: ANTONGIOVANNI, MICHAEL; Attorney: DAKE, STEPHEN M

Ex Parte Hearing

Ex Parte Hearing 091415: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING NOTE- 1. Need Ex Parte Declaration to FCS & Veronica Boolootian.; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: DAKE, STEPHEN M; Petitioner; Attorney: DAKE, STEPHEN M; Petitioner; Attorney: DAKE, STEPHEN M

Ex Parte Hearing

MO 060915: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Trial; Comment: PD EX PARTE; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: DAKE, STEPHEN M; Petitioner; Attorney: DAKE, STEPHEN M; Petitioner; Attorney: DAKE, STEPHEN M

Petition for Appointment of Conservator

PETITION FOR CONSERVATOR/ EX PARTES PETITION: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - PETITION FOR APPT NOTE - 1. Missing attachment to petition re special orders requested (form GC-313).

Ex Parte Hearing

EX PARTE REQUEST TO CHANGE RESIDENCE OF CONSERVATEE: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - TEMPORARY CONSERVATORS EX PARTE PETITION NOTE - 1. Need proof of service.

Ex Parte Hearing

EX PARTE ORDER COMPELLING: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - PD'S EX PARTE PETITION

Final Accounting

Final Accounting 01/10/2018: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - .NOTE- 1. Supplement filed 11/16/17 missing all petitioners' signatures.; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: DAKE, STEPHEN M; Petitioner; Attorney: DAKE, STEPHEN M; Petitioner; Attorney: DAKE, STEPHEN M

Compliance Hearing

(2) Petition for Fees and Compliance Hearing 07/26/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Multiple Motions-Various Issues; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - COMPLIANCE HEARING SAME NOTE - 1. As of 6/16/17, the accounting has not been submitted for filing. 7/26/17 CALENDAR #2; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: DAKE, STEPHEN M; Petitioner; Attorney: DAKE, STEPHEN M; Petitioner; Attorney: DAKE, STEPHEN M

Compliance Hearing

Compliance Hearing 03/06/2017: Judicial Officer: Seidman, David; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING NOTE - 1. As of 2/2/17, the accounting has not been submitted for filing.; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: DAKE, STEPHEN M; Petitioner; Attorney: DAKE, STEPHEN M; Petitioner; Attorney: DAKE, STEPHEN M

Compliance Hearing

Compliance Hearing 09/20/2016: Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING SAME NOTE: 1. As of 8/22/16, the I&A & accounting have not been submitted for filing.

Compliance Hearing

03/01/16 MO - COMPLIANCE HEARING: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING NOTE: 1. As of 2/4/16, the Inventory & Notice of How to File Objections to I&A have not been submitted for filing.; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: DAKE, STEPHEN M; Petitioner; Attorney: DAKE, STEPHEN M; Petitioner; Attorney: DAKE, STEPHEN M

Ruling

Minue Order Ruling 1/20/16: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Petition for Appointment of Conservator

PETITION FOR CONSERVATOR: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING SAME NOTE - 1. Missing attachment to petition re special orders requested (form GC-313). 10/07/15 CALENDAR #1; Parties Present Petitioner: MCCREADY, VALYNE; Attorney: DAKE, STEPHEN M; Petitioner: TAZIOLI, ROBERT; Attorney: DAKE, STEPHEN M; Petitioner: ANTONGIOVANNI, MICHAEL; Attorney: DAKE, STEPHEN M

Petition for Appointment of Conservator

PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF CONSERVATOR: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING SAME NOTE - 1. Missing attachment to petition re special orders requested (form GC-313).; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: DAKE, STEPHEN M; Petitioner; Attorney: DAKE, STEPHEN M; Petitioner; Attorney: DAKE, STEPHEN M

Ex Parte Hearing

Original Type: Ex Parte Hearing; Ex parte 050715: Judicial Officer: Wyatt, Ralph W.; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: DAKE, STEPHEN M; Petitioner; Attorney: DAKE, STEPHEN M; Petitioner: ANTONGIOVANNI, MICHAEL; Attorney: DAKE, STEPHEN M

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2018
  • DocketOrder - Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Comment: Prder on petition for approval of accounting, for an order discharging the co-conservators and for an order exonerating bond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinal Accounting - Final Accounting 01/10/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - .NOTE- 1. Supplement filed 11/16/17 missing all petitioners' signatures.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinal Accounting - Final Accounting 11/22/2017: Judicial Officer: Myers, Brett; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - NOTE- 1. Supplement filed 11/16/17 missing all petitioners' signatures.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • DocketSupplement - Comment: Supplement to petition for approval of accounting, for an order discharging the co-conservators and for an order exonerating bond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • DocketCompliance Hearing - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Cancel Reason: In Compliance; Comment: re: accounting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • DocketOrder - Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Comment: Order for attorney's fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: 11/22/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Fees - (2) Petition for Fees and Compliance Hearing 07/26/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - PD'S PETITION FOR FEES 7/26/17 CALENDAR #1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCompliance Hearing - (2) Petition for Fees and Compliance Hearing 07/26/2017: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Multiple Motions-Various Issues; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - COMPLIANCE HEARING SAME NOTE - 1. As of 6/16/17, the accounting has not been submitted for filing. 7/26/17 CALENDAR #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • DocketFinal Account and Report and Petition for Distribution

    Read MoreRead Less
104 More Docket Entries
  • 04/01/2015
  • DocketReferral for Investigative Report - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2015
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Conservator - Comment: SET 6/1/15 AT 900 AM DIV:P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2015
  • DocketCapacity Declaration - Conservatorship - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2015
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Temporary Conservator - Comment: SET 4/21/15 AT 900 AM DIV:P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2015
  • DocketEx Parte Application / Petition - Comment: REQUEST FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS EX PARTE COMPLIANCE (PROBATE) DECLARATION OF STEPHEN M DAKE IN SUPPORT THEREOF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2015
  • Docket824H Pmt: Probate - Req Hearing GC 70657(A)(3) 8/6/12 - Comment: Amount of $60.00 for MCCREADY, VALYNE (PE-1). Received from STEPHEN DAKE, check no(s) 4409. Receipt #831616 for amount of $60.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2015
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2015
  • Docket880D PMT: Probate Petition For Appt of Conservator, - Comment: Amount of $435.00 for MCCREADY, VALYNE (PE-1). Received from DAKE, BRAUN AND MONJE, check no(s) 4405. Receipt #829461 for amount of $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2015
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2015
  • DocketNew Case Filed - Comment: Post Conversion Addition for Reporting

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FAMILY COURT SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAKE, STEPHEN M