This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/17/2018 at 19:19:59 (UTC).

MARIN ET AL VS CHERRY HILL ESTATES, LLC. A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/10/2015 MARIN filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against CHERRY HILL ESTATES, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Chapin, Sidney P. and Schuett, Stephen D.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0466

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Chapin, Sidney P.

Schuett, Stephen D.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PACHECO, ANGELICA

CRUZ, JORGE C.

VALENCIA, ROGELIO

GARCIA, CAMILO

DIAZ, DAVID

Defendant

CHERRY HILL ESTATES, LLC. A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Cross Plaintiff

ADC DEVELOPMENT, INC.

Cross Defendants

L.G. CULTURE MARBLE

MERZON INDUSTRIES

PERFECTION IRON PAINTING

MIKE'S FENCING, INC.

MELENDEZ, CATALINO

MASCO CORPORATION

ALVIDREZ & TILLETT TILE, INC.

MCNEILL MASONRY, INC.

MAURO, ERNEST WILLIAM

SANDERS, GERALD A.

60 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EDWARDS, LUCAS A

Defendant Attorneys

RIVERA, JESSE M.

HEWITT, SHANAN L

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

GELEGAN, JACOB A.

Cross Defendant Attorney

LOUREIRO, KARL R

Other Attorneys

VAIRETTA, WENDI NICOLE

CRAWFORD, DAVID

LAMOND, CHRISTIAN F

MOORE, PENNY S

AMIR-MOKRI, NAMVAR

BALL, PATRICK R.

BOGGS, JOSIAH C., IV

RUTHERFORD, KARI L

HAMMONS, WALLACE W

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference

Minute Order-Case Management Conference - 1/13/16: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: EDWARDS, LUCAS A; Plaintiff; Attorney: EDWARDS, LUCAS A; Plaintiff; Attorney: EDWARDS, LUCAS A; Plaintiff; Attorney: EDWARDS, LUCAS A; Plaintiff; Attorney: EDWARDS, LUCAS A; Plaintiff; Attorney: EDWARDS, LUCAS A; Plaintiff; Attorney: EDWARDS, LUCAS A; Plaintiff; Attorney: EDWARDS, LUCAS A; Plaintiff; Attorney: EDWARDS, LUCAS A; Plaintiff; Attorney: EDWARDS, LUCAS A; Plaintiff; Attorney: EDWARDS, LUCAS A; Plaintiff; Attorney: EDWARDS, LUCAS A; Plaintiff; Attorney: EDWARDS, LUCAS A; Plaintiff; Attorney: EDWARDS, LUCAS A; Plaintiff; Attorney: EDWARDS, LUCAS A; Plaintiff; Attorney: EDWARDS, LUCAS A; Plaintiff; Attorney: EDWARDS, LUCAS A; Cross Complainant; Attorney: GELEGAN, JACOB A.; Cross Complainant; Attorney: GELEGAN, JACOB A.; Cross Complainant; Attorney: GELEGAN, JACOB A.

Further Case Management Conference

02/16/16 MO: Further Case Management Conference: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: CONT'D FROM 01/13/16; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: EDWARDS, LUCAS A; Plaintiff; Attorney: EDWARDS, LUCAS A; Plaintiff; Attorney: EDWARDS, LUCAS A; Plaintiff; Attorney: EDWARDS, LUCAS A; Plaintiff; Attorney: EDWARDS, LUCAS A; Plaintiff; Attorney: EDWARDS, LUCAS A; Plaintiff; Attorney: EDWARDS, LUCAS A; Plaintiff; Attorney: EDWARDS, LUCAS A; Plaintiff; Attorney: EDWARDS, LUCAS A; Plaintiff; Attorney: EDWARDS, LUCAS A; Plaintiff; Attorney: EDWARDS, LUCAS A; Plaintiff; Attorney: EDWARDS, LUCAS A; Plaintiff; Attorney: EDWARDS, LUCAS A; Plaintiff; Attorney: EDWARDS, LUCAS A; Plaintiff; Attorney: EDWARDS, LUCAS A; Plaintiff; Attorney: EDWARDS, LUCAS A; Plaintiff; Attorney: EDWARDS, LUCAS A; Cross Complainant; Attorney: GELEGAN, JACOB A.; Cross Complainant; Attorney: GELEGAN, JACOB A.; Cross Complainant; Attorney: GELEGAN, JACOB A.; Cross Defendant; Attorney: VAIRETTA, WENDI NICOLE; Cross Defendant; Attorney: CRAWFORD, DAVID; Cross Defendant; Attorney: CRAWFORD, DAVID

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Limor Lehavi Document: Notice of Association of Counsel (E-filed #555115) Notice must include signature of current attorney and that of the new attorney that is being associated.

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Dismissal, returned via SASE.

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: RETURNED VIA SASE

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Document: Case Management Statement No Case Management Conference on calendar.

Mandatory Settlement Conference

Mandatory Settlement Conference 09/29/2017: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 09:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: to be conducted by Special Master, Jube J. Najarian pursuant to Pre-Trial Order No. 7

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2015
  • DocketCause of Action: Cross-Complaint; Type: Cross Action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2015
  • DocketCause of Action: Cross-Complaint; Type: Cross Action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: WHY MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketJury Trial - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Notice of Settlement Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • DocketFinal Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 01:00 PM; Cancel Reason: Notice of Settlement Filed; Comment: Jury Trial 08/14/17 Time estimate: unknown

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • DocketNotice of Settlement - Conditional - Comment: AS TO CROSS COMPLAINT OF CHERRY HILLS ESTATES, LLC ET AL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • DocketRuling - Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • DocketOrder Confirming Good Faith Settlement - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Comment: AS TO SACRAMENTO INSULATIONS CONTRACTORS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • DocketOrder Confirming Good Faith Settlement - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Comment: AS TO WESTERN INSULATION LP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • DocketRuling - Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
124 More Docket Entries
  • 10/27/2015
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: Answer Rejected: Answering defendants not named on complaint.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2015
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: As to ADC Development, Inc. personal service 9/10/15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2015
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: As to CEK Inc. personal service 9/13/15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2015
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: As to Cherry Hill Estates, LLC personal service 9/10/15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2015
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint - Comment: First Amendment to complaint naming additional homeowners. Leticia Jackson Jorge C. Cruz Angelica Pacheco

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ACTIVE LEGAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: Re: CRC 3.110 Hearing Date: 10/30/2015 Hearing Time: 8:30 A.M. Hearing Department/Division: 4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MERZON INDUSTRIES is a litigant

Latest cases where Masco Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BALL PATRICK RYAN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VAIRETTA WENDI