This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 01:10:55 (UTC).

MARIE M JENSEN DECEASED

Case Summary

On 05/12/2015 MARIE M JENSEN DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Loo, Cynthia L., Knight, Alisa R. and Kendall, Andrew. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2003

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Loo, Cynthia L.

Knight, Alisa R.

Kendall, Andrew

 

Party Details

Petitioners

OBERG, KAREN

JENSEN, C ARLO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SALVO, ALICE A

 

Court Documents

Compliance Hearing

Compliance Hearing 11/21/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - NOTE - 1. As of 11/12/19, 12200 status report or petition to close estate has not been filed.

Hearing on Status Report PC 12200

Hearing on Status Report PC 12200 06/06/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING

Petition for Sale

Petition for Sale 12/20/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - re 22917 Oxnard Street, Woodland Hills, CA 91367; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: SALVO, ALICE A; Petitioner; Attorney: SALVO, ALICE A

Hearing on Status Report PC 12200

Hearing on Status Report PC 12200 11/29/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: SALVO, ALICE A; Petitioner; Attorney: SALVO, ALICE A

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Report of sale...returned via file & serve

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Report of sale and petition for order confirming sale of real property

Hearing on Status Report PC 12200

Hearing on Status Report PC 12200 02/16/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: SALVO, ALICE A; Petitioner; Attorney: SALVO, ALICE A

Compliance Hearing

MO COMPLIANCE HEARING: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: Status Report - PC 12200

Compliance Hearing

8/25/16 MO: Compliance Hearing: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING NOTE: 1. As of 8/9/16, the 12200 Status Report or petition to close the estate has not been submitted for filing.; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: SALVO, ALICE A; Petitioner; Attorney: SALVO, ALICE A

Compliance Hearing

COMPLIANCE HEARING: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING NOTE: As of 9/29/15, copies of petitioners' Driver's Licenses have not been filed.

Petition for Letters

AMENDED HEARING FOR PETITION FOR LETTERS: Judicial Officer(s): Knight, Alisa R., Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: SALVO, ALICE A; Petitioner; Attorney: SALVO, ALICE A

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketFinal Distribution/Waiver of Accounting - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: Account and Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketCompliance Hearing - Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: In Compliance; Comment: RE: 12200 STATUS REPORT OR PETITION TO CLOSE ESTATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketAccount and Report - Comment: Account and Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCompliance Hearing - Compliance Hearing 11/21/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - NOTE - 1. As of 11/12/19, 12200 status report or petition to close estate has not been filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing on Status Report PC 12200 - Hearing on Status Report PC 12200 06/06/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • DocketCompliance Hearing - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: In Compliance; Comment: re: proof of deposit and order establishing blocked account

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • DocketReceipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money - Comment: in Blocked Account

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • DocketOrder Confirming Sale of Real Property - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Sale - Petition for Sale 12/20/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - re 22917 Oxnard Street, Woodland Hills, CA 91367

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 09/08/2015
  • DocketBond Undertaking

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2015
  • DocketOrder For Probate - Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: Missing additional orders.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • DocketConfidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities of - Comment: Personal Representative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • DocketConfidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities of - Comment: Personal Representative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities of Personal Representative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Letters - AMENDED HEARING FOR PETITION FOR LETTERS: Judicial Officer(s): Knight, Alisa R., Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2015
  • DocketProof of Publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2015
  • DocketNotice of Petition to Administer Estate - Comment: 6/25/2015 @ 9:00am in div. P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2015
  • DocketPetition for Letters of Administration - Comment: Petition for letters of administration authorization to administer under the independent administration of estates act with limited authority

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SALVO ALICE A.