This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 05/30/2023 at 08:14:31 (UTC).

MARIBELLA LOPEZ VS BEARDSLEY SCHOOL DISTRICT ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/31/2023 MARIBELLA LOPEZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BEARDSLEY SCHOOL DISTRICT. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0307

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARIBELLA LOPEZ

Defendants

DOE, JOHN

BEARDSLEY SCHOOL DISTRICT, A PUBLIC ENTITY

CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, A PUBLIC ENTITY

CITY OF BAKERSFIELD, A PUBLIC ENTITY

COUNTY OF KERN, A PUBLIC ENTITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AZIZI DANIEL

 

Court Documents

Complaint

01/31/2023: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

01/31/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

Summons Issued and Filed

01/31/2023: Summons Issued and Filed

Order to Show Cause

02/01/2023: Order to Show Cause

Application / Order Appointing Guardian ad Litem (Civil)

02/02/2023: Application / Order Appointing Guardian ad Litem (Civil)

Summons Issued and Filed

02/07/2023: Summons Issued and Filed

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

05/17/2023: Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Dept.: Bakersfield Traffic Courtroom 2 located at 3131 Arrow Street

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110; Dept.: Bakersfield Traffic Courtroom 2 located at 3131 Arrow Street

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingHearing Type: Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110; Dept.: Bakersfield Traffic Courtroom 2 located at 3131 Arrow Street; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - MARIBELLA LOPEZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Application / Order Appointing Guardian ad Litem (Civil); Comment: APPOINTING MAGALI ARECHIGA AS GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR MARIBELLA LOPEZ A MINOR; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - MARIBELLA LOPEZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - MARIBELLA LOPEZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Order to Show Cause; Comment: Re: 3.110Hearing Date: 5/17/2023Hearing Time: 8:30 amHearing Department/Division: H

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010); Filed By: PLAINTIFF - MARIBELLA LOPEZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Complaint; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - MARIBELLA LOPEZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less