This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/21/2020 at 13:15:45 (UTC).

MANZO VS MANZO

Case Summary

On 06/29/2017 MANZO filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MANZO. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Shafter / Wasco Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Camacho, Marcos R., McKnight, Ralph L., Jr., Katz, Steven M., Shayer, Steven, Tafoya, Robert S., Dulcich, Judith K. and Benavides, Jose R.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0133

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Shafter / Wasco Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Camacho, Marcos R.

McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.

Katz, Steven M.

Shayer, Steven

Tafoya, Robert S.

Dulcich, Judith K.

Benavides, Jose R.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MANZO, MARTIN A

Respondents

MANZO, CHARITY RENEE

MANZO, CHARITY R

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

HARRIS, LEON R

Respondent Attorney

WINKLER, B SCOTT

 

Court Documents

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 09/06/2019: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Continued from 07/05/19 and 08/16/19; Parties Present Petitioner: MANZO, MARTIN A; Respondent: MANZO, CHARITY R

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 08/16/2019: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Petitioner: MANZO, MARTIN A; Respondent: MANZO, CHARITY R

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 07/05/2019: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: CHANGE: SPOUSAL SUPPORT; OTHER: RESPONDENT TO REIMBURSE PETITIONER FOR UNAUTHORIZED $8,000 CASHIER CHECK, RESPONDENT TO STOP CONTACTING MY EMPLOYER; Parties Present Petitioner: MANZO, MARTIN A; Respondent: MANZO, CHARITY R

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

Order to Show Cause in re Contempt (Respondent)

Order to Show Cause in re Contempt (Respondent) 01/25/2019: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Dropped; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: HARRIS, LEON R; Respondent: MANZO, CHARITY R

Court Trial

Court Trial 09/28/2018: Judicial Officer: Shayer, Steven; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Judgment; Comment: RE: Spousal Support and possible Dodge Dart; Parties Present Petitioner: MANZO, MARTIN A; Attorney: HARRIS, LEON R; Respondent: MANZO, CHARITY R; Attorney: WINKLER, B SCOTT

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 08/24/2018: Judicial Officer: Shayer, Steven; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Petitioner: MANZO, MARTIN A; Attorney: HARRIS, LEON R; Respondent: MANZO, CHARITY R; Attorney: WINKLER, B SCOTT

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 07/20/2018: Judicial Officer: Shayer, Steven; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Stipulated Continuance; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: HARRIS, LEON R; Respondent; Attorney: WINKLER, B SCOTT

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 06/08/2018: Judicial Officer: Dulcich, Judith K.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Draft Incomplete; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: HARRIS, LEON R; Respondent; Attorney: WINKLER, B SCOTT

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 04/27/2018: Judicial Officer: Shayer, Steven; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Stipulated Continuance

Mandatory Settlement Conference

Mandatory Settlement Conference 03/23/2018: Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Stipulated Continuance; Comment: ATTORNEY SCOTT WINKER ON RECORD; TO BE HEARED BY COMMISSIONER SHAYER; Parties Present Petitioner: MANZO, MARTIN A; Respondent: MANZO, CHARITY R; Attorney: WINKLER, B SCOTT

Request for Order - Respondent

Request for Order - Respondent 12/15/2017: Judicial Officer: Camacho, Marcos R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: CHILD CUSTODY, VISITATION, SPOUSAL OR PARTNER SUPPORT, PROPERTY CONTROL, ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS; Parties Present Petitioner: MANZO, MARTIN A; Respondent: MANZO, CHARITY R

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: REQUEST FOR ORDER FL-300

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail - Comment: CORRECTED: FINDINGS & ORDER AFTER HEARING, SPOUSAL SUPPORT INFORMATION & ORDER ATTACHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketFindings and Orders - Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Comment: AFTER HEARING 09/06/2019 **CORRECTED**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail - Comment: FOAH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketFindings and Orders - Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Comment: AFTER HEARING 09/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order - Petitioner - Request for Order - Petitioner 09/06/2019: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Continued from 07/05/19 and 08/16/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • DocketIncome and Expense Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order - Petitioner - Request for Order - Petitioner 08/16/2019: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketNotice - Withdrawal of Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail - Comment: BANK STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order - Petitioner - Request for Order - Petitioner 07/05/2019: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: CHANGE: SPOUSAL SUPPORT; OTHER: RESPONDENT TO REIMBURSE PETITIONER FOR UNAUTHORIZED $8,000 CASHIER CHECK, RESPONDENT TO STOP CONTACTING MY EMPLOYER

    Read MoreRead Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 11/02/2017
  • DocketRequest for Order (FL-300) - Comment: CHILD CUSTODY, VISITATION, SPOUSAL OR PARTNER SUPPORT, PROPERTY CONTROL, ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: REQUEST FOR ORDER FL-300

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • DocketResponse - Comment: TO DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • DocketFamily Law Documents - Requested By: MANZO, MARTIN A; Served: 07/14/20178:05 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • DocketAffidavit - Paralegal / Typing Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less