This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 20:13:09 (UTC).

MANZO ET AL VS GROVER GARDENS LLC

Case Summary

On 02/10/2017 MANZO filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against GROVER GARDENS LLC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Chapin, Sidney P., Clark, Thomas S., Schuett, Stephen D. and Lampe, David R.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0298

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Chapin, Sidney P.

Clark, Thomas S.

Schuett, Stephen D.

Lampe, David R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

URIARTE, VICTOR M.

RODRIGUEZ, LORENA

AVILA, ZUJEY

PIMENTEL, JUVENAL

URIARTE, CHRISTOPHER

MEDINA, RENE

URQUIZO, MONICO

BENAVIDEZ, PEDRO

MANZO, VICTOR

TORRES, FRANCISCO

GARCIA, ARTURO P.

MACIEL, DAVID

GARIBAY, ANGELA G.

CORTEZ, RAMON A.

TORRES, JOSE LUIS

PIMENTEL, MARTHA

BENAVIDEZ, BRENDA

FELIX, ERIKA

LOPEZ, VERENIZ

Defendant

S & S HOMES OF THE CENTRAL COAST, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BELTON, JEFFREY T

Defendant Attorney

FELD, JASON DANIEL

Other Attorneys

MILIONIS, GEORGE K

DAILEY, TIMOTHY P

GONZALEZ, SCOTT M

FIDGER, ANGELA R

NAGPAL, VIK

ARABI, ARASH S

PAIGE, ROBERT N

MORROW, WILLIAM D

SCHONEMAN, TINA L

FIELDS, GARY D

HAGAN, CHRISTOPHER J

CRAWFORD, DAVID

BERNARD, RANDALL K.

SCANLON, TIMOTHY G

LAMARRA, KEITH N

CRESPO, DANIEL A

HAMMONS, WALLACE W

TSANG, KENNETH B.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 12/20/2017: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: RE STATUS HEARING SET PER CMO #4 TRIAL DATE 02/14/2019; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Cross Defendant; Attorney: SCANLON, TIMOTHY G

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT. ANSWER WAS PREVIOUSLY FILED ON 8/8/17 BY BRUMFIELD & HAGAN, LLP

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: ANSWER. PREVIOUSLY FILED BY RESNICK & LOUIS, P.C.ON 6/23/17.

Further Case Management Conference

10/10/17 Amended MO: Further Case Management Conference: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: CONT'D FROM 08/09/17 CMO DUE 10/03/17; Parties Present Cross Defendant; Attorney: SCHONEMAN, TINA L; Cross Defendant; Attorney: DAILEY, TIMOTHY P; Cross Defendant; Attorney: GONZALEZ, SCOTT M; Cross Defendant; Attorney: SCHONEMAN, TINA L; Cross Defendant; Attorney: CRAWFORD, DAVID; Cross Complainant; Attorney: SCHONEMAN, TINA L; Cross Defendant; Attorney: SCHONEMAN, TINA L; Cross Defendant; Attorney: CRAWFORD, DAVID; Cross Defendant; Attorney: CRAWFORD, DAVID

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 08/09/2017: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: FELD, JASON DANIEL; Defendant; Attorney: FELD, JASON DANIEL; Defendant; Attorney: FELD, JASON DANIEL; Cross Defendant; Attorney: PAIGE, ROBERT N; Cross Defendant; Attorney: PAIGE, ROBERT N; Cross Defendant; Attorney: SCHONEMAN, TINA L; Cross Defendant; Attorney: DAILEY, TIMOTHY P; Cross Defendant; Attorney: PAIGE, ROBERT N; Attorney: GONZALEZ, SCOTT M; Cross Complainant; Attorney: FELD, JASON DANIEL; Cross Complainant; Attorney: FELD, JASON DANIEL; Cross Defendant; Attorney: FIDGER, ANGELA R; Cross Defendant; Attorney: FIDGER, ANGELA R; Attorney: SCHONEMAN, TINA L; Cross Defendant; Attorney: FIDGER, ANGELA R; Attorney: PAIGE, ROBERT N; Cross Complainant; Attorney: SCHONEMAN, TINA L; Cross Defendant; Attorney: SCHONEMAN, TINA L

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Scott Gonzalez Document: Association of Counsel and Notice of Jury Deposit Current attorney and attorney being associated must both sign the notice.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: ANSWER: FIRST APPEARANCE AND COMPLEX CASE FEES MUST BE SUBMITTED AT THE TIME OF FILING.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: ANSWER: FIRST APPEARANCE AND COMPLEX CASE FEES MUST BE SUBMITTED AT THE TIME OF FILING.

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: SUMMONS DOES NOT CONFORM TO COMPLAINT

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: RE: ORDER FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT - YOUR ORDER DOESN'T MATCH YOUR APPLICATION - YOU HAVE DIFFERENT PARTIES LISTED - IRONSHORE INSURANCE COMPANY ON THE APPLICATION - BROKEN DRUM ON THE ORDER

Ruling

Ruling 10/04/2018: Hearing Time: 02:30 PM; Result: Ruling

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: TO JASON FELD: REJECTING DOCUMENTS. IT IS IMPORTANT THAT YOU NOTE "AMENDED" ON YOUR FILING BECAUSE YOUR ORIGINAL FILING WAS STAMPED DATE AND ACCEPTED ERRONEOUSLY. THANK YOU

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 03/21/2018: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: cont 12/20/17 RE STATUS time est jury trial HEARING SET PER CMO #4 TRIAL DATE 02/14/2019

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: RE: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT RETURNED VIA E-FILE

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: SUMMONS DOES NOT CONFORM TO COMPLAINT.

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: CROSS COMPLAINT & SUMMONS: FIRST APPEARANCE AND COMPLEX CASE FEES MUST BE SUBMITTED FOR ALL ANSWERING PARTIES AT THE TIME OF FILING.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: ANSWER: FIRST APPEARANCE AND COMPLEX CASE FEES MUST BE SUBMITTED FOR ALL ANSWERING PARTIES AT THE TIME OF FILING.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: ANSWER: FIRST APPEARANCE AND COMPLEX CASE FEES MUST BE SUBMITTED AT THE TIME OF FILING.

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2019
  • DocketJury Trial - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Stipulation Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • DocketFinal Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Stipulation Filed; Comment: T/E TBD JT 06/17/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: as to Intervernor Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Stipulation Filed; Comment: T/E TBD (D-10) FCMC 06/07/19 TD 06/17/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: As to Complaint in Intervention of Arch Specialty Insurance Company on behalf of Prime Plumbing - ONLY - Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition) - Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition) 04/25/2019: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: re: Settlement Stauts

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: as to the Cross-Complaint and First Amended Cross-Complaint of S&S Homes and Grover Gardens - ONLY - Without Prejudice - Returned E-File

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: as to the XDeft Coronel Construction from XComplaint of S&S Homes & Grover Gardens - With Prejudice - Returned E-File

    Read MoreRead Less
314 More Docket Entries
  • 03/21/2017
  • DocketStipulation and Order - Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Comment: Filing of plaintiffs first amended complaint.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • DocketNotice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees - Comment: Notice of Deposit of Jury Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: As to Grover Gardens, LLC. Sub service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: As to S & S Homes of the Central Coast. Personal Service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 03/07/2017; Served: 03/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: SUMMONS DOES NOT CONFORM TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 5/26/2017 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

e Pr———

JODY STEINBERG, ESQ., SBN 144564 SAMUEL R. NORA, ESQ., SBN 287448 HANGER, STEINBERG, SHAPIRO & ASH A Law Corporation

21031 Ventura Blvd., Suite 800

Woodland Hills, CA 91364-6512 (818)226-1222 Fax (818)226-1215

Attorneys for Cross-Defendant

ALL AMERICAN CARPET SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA FOR THE COUNTY OF KERN

VICTOR MANZO, EDGAR AVALOS, CASE NO. BCV-17-100298-SPC CARLOS BALLESTEROS, PEDRO & BRENDA BENAVIDEZ, CLEOFAS (Assigned for all purposes to CARRANZA & ZUJEY AVILA, JOSE Judge Sidney P. Chapin, Dept. 4)

CASTILLO, RAMON A. CORTEZ,

RICARDO DIAZ, ERIKA FELIX, JAMES & ALL AMERICAN CARPET’S ANSWER SUSAN FRAGOSO, GIOVANNI GARCIA, TO CROSS-COMPLAINT OF S&S ARTURO P. GARCIA & ADELA HOMES OF THE CENTRAL COAST, ALVARDO, JOSE A. & ANGELA G. INC. AND GROVER GARDENS, LL.C GARIBAY, JOSE DANIEL & MARIA

GOMEZ, ARNULFO EDGAR GOMEZ, Discovery Cut-off: January 5, 2019

LEONEL LOPEZ, VERENIZ LOPEZ, DAVID| Motion Cut-off: January 20, 2019 MACIEL & ANNA ROCIO PONCE, IRENE FSC Date: January 25, 2019 MEDINA, JOAQUIN MEDINA, REYNA Trial Date: February 4, 2019

MEXIA, ERNESTO MEZA, LETICIA PANIAGUA, MARTHA & JUVENAL PIMENTEL, TRINIDAD REYES & LORENA RODRIGUEZ, JOSE LUIS TORRES, FRANCISCO TORRES, VICTOR M. URIARTE, CHRISTOPHER URIARTE, MONICO URQUIZO, FELIX VILLALOVOS and ROES 1-300, inclusive,

Plaintiffs, VS.

GROVER GARDENS LLC, A California Limtted Liability Company; S & S HOMES OF THE CENTRAL COAST, INC., A California Corporation; and DOES 1-300 inclusive,

Defendants.