This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/30/2020 at 23:01:48 (UTC).

MAGORIAN VS. MAGORIAN

Case Summary

On 04/07/2015 MAGORIAN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MAGORIAN. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Shafter / Wasco Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Dulcich, Judith K., Camacho, Marcos R. and Shayer, Steven. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2128

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Shafter / Wasco Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Dulcich, Judith K.

Camacho, Marcos R.

Shayer, Steven

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MAGORIAN, FRANCES SMITH

Respondent

MAGORIAN, STACY LOWELL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

WINKLER, B SCOTT

Attorney at LAW OFC SCOTT WINKLER

400 Central Valley Hwy

Shafter, CA 93263

Respondent Attorney

RUBIO, NIEVES

 

Court Documents

Case Status Conference

Case Status Conference 12/07/2018: Judicial Officer: Shayer, Steven; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Dropped; Comment: RE: Sale of home; Parties Present Petitioner: MAGORIAN, FRANCES SMITH; Respondent: MAGORIAN, STACY LOWELL

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: INTERSPOUSAL DEED

Request for Order - Respondent

Request for Order - Respondent 10/26/2018: Judicial Officer: Shayer, Steven; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: OTHER: OST/COMPELL SIGNTAURE ON GRANT DEED; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: WINKLER, B SCOTT; Respondent: MAGORIAN, STACY LOWELL

Review

Review 10/26/2018: Judicial Officer: Shayer, Steven; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Multiple Motions-Similar Issues; Comment: Continued from 09/28/18; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: WINKLER, B SCOTT; Respondent: MAGORIAN, STACY LOWELL

Review

Review 09/28/2018: Judicial Officer: Shayer, Steven; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: WINKLER, B SCOTT

Court Trial

Court Trial 07/13/2018: Judicial Officer: Shayer, Steven; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: WINKLER, B SCOTT; Respondent: MAGORIAN, STACY LOWELL

Court Trial

Court Trial 06/29/2018: Judicial Officer(s): Shayer, Steven, Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Stipulated Continuance; Comment: continued from 5/25/18; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: WINKLER, B SCOTT; Respondent: MAGORIAN, STACY LOWELL

Court Trial

Court Trial 05/25/2018: Judicial Officer: Shayer, Steven; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Stipulated Continuance; Parties Present Petitioner: MAGORIAN, FRANCES SMITH; Attorney: WINKLER, B SCOTT; Respondent: MAGORIAN, STACY LOWELL

Mandatory Settlement Conference - Further

Mandatory Settlement Conference - Further 04/13/2018: Judicial Officer: Shayer, Steven; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held

Mandatory Settlement Conference

Mandatory Settlement Conference 02/16/2018: Judicial Officer: Shayer, Steven; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Stipulated Continuance; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: WINKLER, B SCOTT

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketNotice - Withdrawal of Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • DocketNotice - Withdrawal of Attorney - Comment: Notice of Withdrawal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • DocketFindings and Orders - Judicial Officer: Shayer, Steven; Comment: AFTER HEARING 10/26/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Status Conference - Case Status Conference 12/07/2018: Judicial Officer: Shayer, Steven; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Dropped; Comment: RE: Sale of home

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: INTERSPOUSAL DEED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order - Respondent - Request for Order - Respondent 10/26/2018: Judicial Officer: Shayer, Steven; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: OTHER: OST/COMPELL SIGNTAURE ON GRANT DEED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReview - Review 10/26/2018: Judicial Officer: Shayer, Steven; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Multiple Motions-Similar Issues; Comment: Continued from 09/28/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service - Comment: 10/26/18-Proof of Personal Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • DocketRequest for Order (FL-300) - Comment: OTHER: OST/COMPELL SIGNTAURE ON GRANT DEED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • DocketEx Parte Compliance - Comment: OST Compliance Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 06/24/2016
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Preliminary/Final Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2015
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: DISMISS RESPONSE TO DISSOLUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2015
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Denied / Ineligible - Judicial Officer: Dulcich, Judith K.; Comment: payment due on 05/29/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2015
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2015
  • DocketResponse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2015
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2015
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2015
  • Docket805L Pmt: New Suit - Family Law GC 70670(B) (8/6/12) - Comment: Amount of $435.00 for MAGORIAN, FRANCES SMITH (PE-1). Received from FRANCES SMITH MAGORIAN, check no(s) 1966. Receipt #832600 for amount of $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2015
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.