This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 12/14/2018 at 07:38:22 (UTC).

MAGED GERGES DBA STAR TABACCO VS ALPHA TECHNOLOGIES & ALARM SYSTEMS, INC.

Case Summary

On 06/12/2017 MAGED GERGES DBA STAR TABACCO filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ALPHA TECHNOLOGIES ALARM SYSTEMS, INC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Etienne, Linda S. and Robertson, Murray J.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3108

  • Filing Date:

    06/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Etienne, Linda S.

Robertson, Murray J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MAGED GERGES DBA STAR TABACCO

MAGED GERGES DBA STAR TOBACCO

Defendant

ALPHA TECHNOLOGIES & ALARM SYSTEMS, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

NORIEGA, ROBERT J

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: ORDER ON MOTION; MANDATORY E-FILE

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 11/27/2017: Judicial Officer: Robertson, Murray J.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Re: imposition of additional sanctions as to plaintiff's counsel for failure to comply with California Rules of Court, Rule 3.110 and failure to appear at the Order to Show Cause hearing heard on August 25, 2017.; Parties Present Plaintiff: MAGED GERGES DBA STAR TOBACCO

Case Management Conference

CMC/Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 01/29/2018: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Cont'd from 12/11/17 and 12/27/17

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 12/27/2017: Judicial Officer: Robertson, Murray J.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Cont'd from 12/11/17; Parties Present Plaintiff: MAGED GERGES DBA STAR TOBACCO

Motion to Compel

Motion to Compel 09/20/2018: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 08/17/2018 Defendant: Alpha Technologies & Alarm System, Inc., Motion for Order that Truth of Matters be Deemed Admitted and Request for Monetary Sanctions. ResID: 32748,; Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: NORIEGA, ROBERT J

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 09/25/2017: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 04/02/2018: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Cont'd from 01/29/18; Parties Present Plaintiff: MAGED GERGES DBA STAR TOBACCO

Motion to Set Aside (Pre-Disposition)

Motion to Set Aside (Pre-Disposition) 05/17/2018: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 4/17/2018 DEFENDANT ALPHA TECHNOLOGIES & ALARM SYSTEMS, INC. MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT CCP 473(B) AND 473.5(A); Parties Present Plaintiff: MAGED GERGES DBA STAR TOBACCO; Defendant; Attorney: NORIEGA, ROBERT J

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 06/04/2018: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff: MAGED GERGES DBA STAR TOBACCO; Defendant; Attorney: NORIEGA, ROBERT J

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 12/11/2017: Judicial Officer: Robertson, Murray J.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: TO MAGED GERGES dba STAR TOBACCO: REJECTING JUDGMENT. PER COMMISSIONER ETIENNE: PROPOSED JUDGMENT REJECTED. DOCUMENTS SUBMITTED DO NOT COMPLY WITH REQUIREMENTS OF CRC RULE 3.1800(a)(1)-(3). DECLARATION SUBMITTED DOES NOT SUPPORT JUDGMENT ON CONTRACT SUED ON.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • Final Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • Jury Trial - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • Request for Dismissal (Entire)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • Notice of Entry - Comment: Notice of Entry of Order Granting Motion for Order That Truth of Matters be Deemed Admitted and Request for Monetary Sanctions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • Order Granting Motion - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: for order tha truth of matters be deemed admitted and request for monetary sanctions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • Letter Received - Comment: September 27, 2018 Letter re: proposed order on motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: ORDER ON MOTION; MANDATORY E-FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion to Compel - Motion to Compel 09/20/2018: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 08/17/2018 Defendant: Alpha Technologies & Alarm System, Inc., Motion for Order that Truth of Matters be Deemed Admitted and Request for Monetary Sanctions. ResID: 32748,; Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: NORIEGA, ROBERT J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • Notice of Motion - Comment: Motion for Order that Truth of Matters be Deemed Admitted and Request for Monetary Sanction, Hearing Date: 09/20/2018 at 8:30 am, Department 12.

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 12/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference - Case Management Conference 12/11/2017: Judicial Officer: Robertson, Murray J.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 11/27/2017: Judicial Officer: Robertson, Murray J.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Re: imposition of additional sanctions as to plaintiff's counsel for failure to comply with California Rules of Court, Rule 3.110 and failure to appear at the Order to Show Cause hearing heard on August 25, 2017.; Parties Present Plaintiff: MAGED GERGES DBA STAR TOBACCO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • Order to Appear and Order to Show Cause - Comment: 11/27/17, 830am, dept 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 09/25/2017: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA PRO PER BIN "M"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 09/25/17 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division:12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.