This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 08/28/2018 at 11:55:03 (UTC).

MAGANA VS DUHE

Case Summary

On 08/31/2017 MAGANA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DUHE. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lampe, David R.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2038

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lampe, David R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DUARTE, ALBERTO

MAGANA, MARVIN

MERLOS, EDGAR

Defendants

CITY OF BAKERSFIELD

DUHE, JOHN LEON

BRANTLEY, DAVID

LAVENEZIANA, EMANUEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REDMOND, GREGORY S

Defendant Attorneys

GALLAGHER, DENNIS P, II

YATES, M JACQUELINE

 

Court Documents

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. MUST HAVE LEAVE OFCOURT TO FILE.

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: COVERSHEET SUBMITTED ALONG WITH ALL OTHER DOCUMENTS

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date:12/14/2017 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:11

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2018
  • Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: 2/1/2018 DEFENDANTS CITY OF BAKERSFIELD, DAVID BRANTLEY MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES, SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES AND REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS ResID: 29037

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Case Consolidation; Comment: As to, Defendant Emanuel Laveneziana. Missing First Paper Fee for Defendant Emanuel Laveneziana.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Case Consolidation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • Letter Received - Comment: Letter From: DENNIS P. GALLAGHER,II Date of Letter: 2/22/2018 Re: CANCELLATION OF 3/6/2018 MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: AS to Emanuel Laveneziana. Personal service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • Opposition - Comment: PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTIONTO COMPEL FOR FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • Response - Comment: Response to Order to Show Cause

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • Case Management Statement - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 11/21/2017
  • First Amended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • Stipulation and Order - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Comment: TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs be allowed to file a First Amended Complaintwithout leave of Court within five (5) calendar days of the date this Order is signed. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants, and each of them, are to file a responsive pleading per Code following accepting service by Notice of of the First Amended Complaint. ****JUDGE DAVID R. LAMPE****10/26/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Electronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. MUST HAVE LEAVE OFCOURT TO FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • Answer to Complaint - Comment: AS TO JOHN LEON DUHE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Electronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: COVERSHEET SUBMITTED ALONG WITH ALL OTHER DOCUMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Order to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date:12/14/2017 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.