This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/09/2021 at 03:39:00 (UTC).

MAGANA ET AL VS SHERRILL

Case Summary

On 08/20/2020 MAGANA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SHERRILL. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Schuett, Stephen D. and Palmer - Retired, William D.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1956

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Schuett, Stephen D.

Palmer - Retired, William D.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MAGANA, MIGUEL ANGEL

GUERRA, FABIOLA

Defendant

SHERRILL, CECIL RAYMOND

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RIVERA, DAVID J

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: CRC 3.110 Hearing Date: 2/17/20 Hearing Time: 8:30 Hearing Department/Division: 10

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Palmer - Retired, William D.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 09/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: CRC 3.110 Hearing Date: 2/17/20 Hearing Time: 8:30 Hearing Department/Division: 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RIVERA, DAVID J