This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/27/2023 at 07:28:47 (UTC).

MACKEY VS AIMES CONSULTING

Case Summary

On 05/06/2021 MACKEY filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against AIMES CONSULTING. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1040

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SHAWNECE MACKEY, ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

MACKEY, SHAWNECE

Defendant

AIMES CONSULTING, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FEGHALI ALLEN V

MOON KANE

Defendant Attorney

ORNELAS SARAH A

 

Court Documents

Case Status Conference

01/11/2023: Case Status Conference

Case Status Conference

01/10/2023: Case Status Conference

Case Management Statement

12/30/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

12/30/2022: Case Management Statement

Electronic Rejection Notice

12/30/2022: Electronic Rejection Notice

Notice

11/14/2022: Notice

Case Status Conference

11/10/2022: Case Status Conference

Ruling

10/10/2022: Ruling

Further Case Management Conference

04/11/2022: Further Case Management Conference

Answer to First Amended Complaint

08/12/2021: Answer to First Amended Complaint

First Amended Complaint

07/13/2021: First Amended Complaint

Ruling/Certificate of Inability

06/29/2021: Ruling/Certificate of Inability

Certificate of Inability to Respond

06/28/2021: Certificate of Inability to Respond

Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

05/25/2021: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

Order to Show Cause

05/12/2021: Order to Show Cause

Complaint

05/06/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

05/06/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

Summons Issued and Filed

05/12/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Status Conference; Dept.: Bakersfield Department 17 located at 1415 Truxtun Avenue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Status Conference; Dept.: Bakersfield Department 17 located at 1415 Truxtun Avenue; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Status Conference; Dept.: Bakersfield Department 17 located at 1415 Truxtun Avenue; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Case Management Statement; Filed By: DEFENDANT - AIMES CONSULTING, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Case Management Statement; Comment: JOINT case management statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Electronic Rejection Notice; Comment: RE: Plaintiff CMC Statement; The hearing will take place in Dept 17, please remove "24". The court address is incorrect, dept 17 is located at 1415 Truxtun Ave, 93301. The form is outdated. Please use the 2021 revised form.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice; Comment: Notice of Continued Case Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Status Conference; Dept.: Bakersfield Department 17 located at 1415 Truxtun Avenue; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice; Comment: of Change of Handling Attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingHearing Type: Ruling; Dept.: Bakersfield Department 17 located at 1415 Truxtun Avenue; Result: Ruling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Demurrer; Comment: Demurrer to the Seventh Cause of Action in the First Amended Complaint for DamagesHearing Date: 10/4/21 at 8:30 a.m. in Department 17; Filed By: DEFENDANT - AIMES CONSULTING, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Answer to First Amended Complaint; Comment: as to Aimes Consulting, Inc.; Filed By: DEFENDANT - AIMES CONSULTING, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: First Amended Complaint; Comment: FIRST AMENDED CLASS AND REPRESENTATIVE ACTION COMPLAINT; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - MACKEY, SHAWNECE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Ruling/Certificate of Inability; Comment: Extension Granted, responsive pleading shall be filed not later than 7-28-21.IT IS SO ORDERED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Certificate of Inability to Respond; Comment: Certificate of Inability to Respond

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: as to Aimes Consulting, Inc., a California corporation via sub service; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - MACKEY, SHAWNECE|PLAINTIFF - SHAWNECE MACKEY, ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Order to Show Cause; Comment: Re: 3.110Hearing Date: 08/25/2021Hearing Time: 8:30AMHearing Department/Division:17

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - MACKEY, SHAWNECE|PLAINTIFF - SHAWNECE MACKEY, ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Complaint; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - MACKEY, SHAWNECE|PLAINTIFF - SHAWNECE MACKEY, ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010); Filed By: PLAINTIFF - MACKEY, SHAWNECE|PLAINTIFF - SHAWNECE MACKEY, ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less