This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 22:31:00 (UTC).

MACHART VS STRINGER

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 MACHART filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against STRINGER. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3038

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MACHART, KEITH

Defendant

STRINGER, STEVEN

 

Court Documents

Small Claims Trial

Small Claims Trial 01/03/2018: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff: MACHART, KEITH

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2018
  • DocketImage of Archived Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties - Comment: (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment Uncontested (CS); Judgment - Non-Monetary Award: Awarded To: STRINGER, STEVEN; Awarded Against: MACHART, KEITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Trial - Small Claims Trial 01/03/2018: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • DocketProof of Service (SC-104) - Comment: AS TO STEVEN STRINGER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: MACHART, KEITH; Served: 10/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Comment: AS TO KEITH MACHART

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees - Comment: AS TO KEITH MACHART

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant - Comment: RETURNED VIA PRO PER BIN "M"

    Read MoreRead Less