This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 21:56:30 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC VS VELASCO

Case Summary

On 07/08/2015 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against VELASCO. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0972

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

VELASCO, JESUS N

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MORRISSEY, SEAN DAVID

ZIDE, FLINT C

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: LVNV FUNDING LLC; Awarded Against: VELASCO, JESUS N; Amount; Damages: $8,306.09; Attorney Fees: $1,495.91; Costs: $302.00; Total: $10104.00; Party: Names: LVNV FUNDING LLC; VELASCO, JESUS N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • Writ of Execution Issued - Comment: COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES /MONEY/DKR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • Memorandum of Costs and Credits

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • Declaration - Comment: OF NON MILITARY STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2016
  • Non-Military Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2016
  • Substitution of Attorneys - Comment: Former Attorney: SEAN MORRISEY New Attorney: FLINT C ZIDE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2016
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2016
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2015
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment - Comment: Judgment Entered 11/30/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2015
  • Judgment by Default by Clerk - Comment: Returned via SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/24/2015
  • Declaration - Comment: for Costs CCP 103 (b)(2); Evid 1550

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2015
  • Request for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment - Comment: as to Jesus N Velasco

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2015
  • Request for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: as to Does 1-10, Inclusive; and First Cause of Action - Breach of Contract

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2015
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: substituted, as to Jesus N Velasco

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Complaint - Comment: FILED BY SEAN D. MORRISSEY

    Read MoreRead Less