This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 21:55:16 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC VS SMITH

Case Summary

On 07/08/2015 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SMITH. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0970

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

SMITH, KIM H

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MORRISSEY, SEAN DAVID

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2016
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: LVNV FUNDING LLC; Awarded Against: SMITH, KIM H; Amount; Damages: $16,505.59; Attorney Fees: $2,650.60; Costs: $447.00; Total: $19603.19; Party: Names: LVNV FUNDING LLC; SMITH, KIM H

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2016
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2016
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Comment: DUPLICATE FILING OF DEFAULT PKG ENTERED ON 03-15-16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2016
  • Judgment by Default by Clerk - Comment: as to KIM H SMITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • Declaration - Comment: Re: Attorney Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • Declaration of Compliance with CCP Section 1033 (B) (2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • Request for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment - Comment: as to KIM H SMITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • Request for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: W/O Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2016
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2015
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: personal, as to Kim H Smith

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Complaint - Comment: FILED BY SEAN D. MORRISSEY

    Read MoreRead Less