Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/17/2018 at 19:21:52 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC VS SANDOVAL

Case Summary

On 07/10/2015 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SANDOVAL. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Delano / Mcfarland Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Tafoya, Robert S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0062

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delano / Mcfarland Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Tafoya, Robert S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

SANDOVAL, MARIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARK, WILLIAM ALBERT

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV); Party: Name: LVNV FUNDING LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2015
  • Request for Dismissal (Entire)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2015
  • Declaration of Due Diligence Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: LVNV FUNDING LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Statement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less