This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 12/25/2022 at 08:58:12 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC VS RAMSEY

Case Summary

On 09/15/2020 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against RAMSEY. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0310

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

RAMSEY, HENRY L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MANDARICH CHRISTOPHER D

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21): Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F): Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

09/15/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

Statement of Classification and Location

09/15/2020: Statement of Classification and Location

Declaration

09/15/2020: Declaration

Complaint

09/15/2020: Complaint

Summons Issued and Filed

09/15/2020: Summons Issued and Filed

Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

09/21/2020: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

Request for Entry of Default and Court Judgment

12/22/2020: Request for Entry of Default and Court Judgment

Request for Dismissal (Partial)

12/22/2020: Request for Dismissal (Partial)

Declaration of Compliance with CCP Section 1033 (B) (2)

12/22/2020: Declaration of Compliance with CCP Section 1033 (B) (2)

Declaration

12/22/2020: Declaration

Declaration

12/22/2020: Declaration

Declaration

12/22/2020: Declaration

Judgment by Default by Court

12/29/2020: Judgment by Default by Court

Memorandum of Credits, Interest and Costs Filed

02/03/2022: Memorandum of Credits, Interest and Costs Filed

Writ of Execution Issued

02/07/2022: Writ of Execution Issued

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: COUNTY OF MADERA - RETURNED VIA E-FILE; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - LVNV FUNDING LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Memorandum of Credits, Interest and Costs Filed; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - LVNV FUNDING LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Judgment by Default by Court; Comment: Emailed to mandarichca@abclegal.com; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - LVNV FUNDING LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Declaration; Comment: Re: Fees; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - LVNV FUNDING LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Declaration; Comment: Re: Copies; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - LVNV FUNDING LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Declaration; Comment: Re: 1788; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - LVNV FUNDING LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Declaration of Compliance with CCP Section 1033 (B) (2); Filed By: PLAINTIFF - LVNV FUNDING LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Request for Dismissal (Partial); Comment: AGAINST DOES 1 THROUGH 10 ONLY; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - LVNV FUNDING LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Request for Entry of Default and Court Judgment; Comment: AGAINST HENRY L RAMSEY; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - LVNV FUNDING LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: As to Henry L Ramsey via personal service.; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - LVNV FUNDING LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - LVNV FUNDING LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Complaint; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - LVNV FUNDING LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Declaration; Comment: Re: Reduced Filing Fee; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - LVNV FUNDING LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Statement of Classification and Location; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - LVNV FUNDING LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010); Filed By: PLAINTIFF - LVNV FUNDING LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mandarich, Christopher D