Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 05/18/2021 at 09:32:57 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC VS PETERSON

Case Summary

On 04/16/2021 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PETERSON. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern River Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Pritchard, Kenneth G. and Pacione, Lisa M.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0034

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kern River Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Pritchard, Kenneth G.

Pacione, Lisa M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

PETERSON, CHARLES P

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KARAYAN, SARKIS S.

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F): Judicial Officer: Pacione, Lisa M.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21): Judicial Officer: Pacione, Lisa M.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F): Judicial Officer: Pacione, Lisa M.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21): Judicial Officer: Pacione, Lisa M.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Declaration of Non-Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Re: Venue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Karayan, Sarkis S