This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 22:54:45 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC VS OROZCO

Case Summary

On 03/20/2017 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against OROZCO. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Etienne, Linda S. and Robertson, Murray J.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1561

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Etienne, Linda S.

Robertson, Murray J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

OROZCO, SARA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZIDE, FLINT C

 

Court Documents

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Writ of Execution

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f)

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) 02/28/2018: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Writ of Execution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: County of Los Angeles

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs - Comment: MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT, AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Robertson, Murray J.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered; Comment: Cont. from 02/18/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: LVNV FUNDING LLC; Awarded Against: OROZCO, SARA; Amount; Damages: $816.71; Costs: $294.50; Total: $1111.21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Clerk - Comment: AS TO SARA OROZCO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Declaration 585

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • DocketNon-Military Declaration - Comment: Declaration RE MILITARY STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • DocketDeclaration of Compliance with CCP Section 1033 (B) (2) - Comment: Declaration 1033

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 02/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) 02/28/2018: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: As to Sara Orozco. Personal Service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 03/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ABC LEGAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketNon-Military Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.