This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/23/2018 at 21:50:32 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC VS MORSE

Case Summary

On 06/30/2017 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MORSE. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Shafter / Wasco Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Palmer, William D. and Shayer, Steven. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0179

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Shafter / Wasco Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Palmer, William D.

Shayer, Steven

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

MORSE, YOLANDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRODBECK, LORI

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2017
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Shayer, Steven; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV); Party: Names: LVNV FUNDING LLC; MORSE, YOLANDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Shayer, Steven; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Shayer, Steven; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • Request for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • Proof of Service - Comment: AS TO YOLANDA MORSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: LVNV FUNDING LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • Non-Military Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • Statement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less