This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 22:34:37 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC VS MCCAA

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MCCAA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Etienne, Linda S. and Robertson, Murray J.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5944

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Etienne, Linda S.

Robertson, Murray J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

MCCAA, KATHY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FERNANDEZ, LORENA O

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f)

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) 09/17/2018: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered; Comment: cont'd from 9/17/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: LVNV FUNDING LLC; Awarded Against: MCCAA, KATHY; Amount; Damages: $2,221.10; Costs: $246.00; Total: $2467.10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: as to Kathy McCaa

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • DocketOrder - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: Granting use of copies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Re: Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Re: Copies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • DocketDeclaration for Default - Comment: Re: 1788

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • DocketDeclaration for Default - Comment: Re: 1033

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: Without prejudice as to Does 1 - 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Court Judgment - Comment: As to Kathy McCaa

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 09/14/2018
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered - Comment: Default Only as to Kathy McCaa

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Robertson, Murray J.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: AS TO KATHY MCCAA, PERSONAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 10/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ABC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Re: Reduction in Filing Fee Pursuant to Business & Professions Code Section 6322.1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less