This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 09/20/2020 at 09:48:49 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC VS JUAREZ

Case Summary

On 05/13/2020 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JUAREZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Arvin / Lamont Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Staley, H. A. "Skip". The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0049

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arvin / Lamont Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Staley, H. A. "Skip"

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

JUAREZ, JUANITA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SWEARINGEN-OJURI, AMBER I.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F):

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21):

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F): Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered; Comment: RE: DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21): Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed; Comment: RE: PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: LVNV FUNDING LLC; Awarded Against: JUAREZ, JUANITA; Amount; Damages: $2,076.62; Costs: $276.00; Total: $2352.62; Party: Names: LVNV FUNDING LLC; JUAREZ, JUANITA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court - Judicial Officer: Staley, H. A. "Skip"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Re: Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketOrder - Judicial Officer: Staley, H. A. "Skip"; Comment: COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Re: 1788

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Re: 1033

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: LVNV FUNDING LLC; Served: 06/19/20205:33 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Re: Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Re: Venue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less