This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 22:35:39 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC VS JAMES

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JAMES. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Green, Kenneth R., Jr. and Webster, Jason W.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0632

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

Webster, Jason W.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

JAMES, DAVID

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRODBECK, LORI

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F): Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21): Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F): Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service - Comment: POS-010 (Proof of Service)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21): Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) 04/12/2018: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketNon-Military Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less