This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 21:56:27 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC VS HEWES

Case Summary

On 07/08/2015 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HEWES. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0969

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

HEWES, THOMAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MORRISSEY, SEAN DAVID

ZIDE, FLINT C

 

Court Documents

Ruling

Ruling: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2017
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: CRC 3.1385

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • Request for Dismissal (Entire) (After Cond Settlement/Stay) - Comment: without prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • Non-Military Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • Substitution of Attorneys - Comment: Former Attorney: SEAN D MORRISSEY New Attorney: FLINT C ZIDE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2016
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2016
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Ruling - Ruling: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2015
  • Notice of Settlement Conditional (JBSIS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2015
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: substituted, as to Thomas Hewes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Complaint - Comment: FILED BY SEAN D. MORRISSEY

    Read MoreRead Less