This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 17:02:37 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC VS HERNANDEZ

Case Summary

On 09/07/2017 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HERNANDEZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Shafter / Wasco Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Palmer, William D., Shayer, Steven and Benavides, Jose R.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0252

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Shafter / Wasco Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Palmer, William D.

Shayer, Steven

Benavides, Jose R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

HERNANDEZ, DORA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZIDE, FLINT C

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV); Party: Names: LVNV FUNDING LLC; HERNANDEZ, DORA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer(s): Benavides, Jose R., Robertson, Murray J.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • DocketRuling - Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • DocketNotice of Settlement - Conditional - Comment: HRG 8/24/18 Notice of Settlement - Conditional

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: LVNV FUNDING LLC; Served: 10/01/201711:10 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: OF NON-MILITARY STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less