This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 22:53:59 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC VS GUERRERO

Case Summary

On 03/20/2017 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GUERRERO. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Etienne, Linda S. and Robertson, Murray J.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1543

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Etienne, Linda S.

Robertson, Murray J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

GUERRERO, WILLIAM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZIDE, FLINT C

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f)

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) 08/09/2018: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Cont'd from 05/08/18 and 06/07/18

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f)

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) 06/07/2018: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Cont. from 05/08/18. Reason for continuance: Default judgment packet to be filed.

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f)

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) 05/08/2018: Judicial Officer: Robertson, Murray J.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Cont'd from 02/27/18

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f)

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) 02/27/2018: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: County of Los Angeles, Returned via e-file.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs - Comment: Memorandum of Costs AFTER JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Declaration OF NON-MILITARY STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered; Comment: cont'd from 08/09/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: LVNV FUNDING LLC; Awarded Against: GUERRERO, WILLIAM; Amount; Damages: $598.22; Costs: $294.50; Total: $892.72

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: Against William Guerrero

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: DECLARATION CCP 585

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: DECLARATION OF NON MILITARY STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: DECLARATION RE 1033

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: DECLARATION RE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 02/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) 02/27/2018: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: AS TO WILLIAM GUERRERO, PERSONAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 04/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ABC LEGAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketNon-Military Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.