This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 21:58:37 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC VS CORMIER

Case Summary

On 07/08/2015 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CORMIER. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0968

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

CORMIER, DEBRA L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MORRISSEY, SEAN DAVID

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/29/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2016
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • Declaration of Non-Service - Comment: AS TO, DEBRA L CORMIER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2016
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2015
  • Request for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: without prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2015
  • Declaration of Non-Service - Comment: as to Debra L Cormier

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Declaration - Comment: FOR REDUCTION IN FILING FEE PURSUANT TO B&P CODE 6322.1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Complaint - Comment: FILED BY SEAN D. MORRISSEY

    Read MoreRead Less