This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 21:12:13 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC VS CANALES, Jr.

Case Summary

On 09/29/2017 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CANALES, Jr. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Shafter / Wasco Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Shayer, Steven and Benavides, Jose R.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0279

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Shafter / Wasco Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Shayer, Steven

Benavides, Jose R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

CANALES, FERNANDO, Jr.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZIDE, FLINT C

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2018
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: LOS ANGELES COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • DocketMemorandum of Credits, Interest and Costs Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • DocketDeclaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Shayer, Steven; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: LVNV FUNDING LLC; Awarded Against: CANALES, FERNANDO, Jr.; Amount; Damages: $2,376.35; Pre-Judgment Interest Rate: 0.00 %; Pre-Judgment Interest: $0.00; Attorney Fees: $0.00; Costs: $348.50; Other: $0.00; Total: $2724.85; Party: Names: LVNV FUNDING LLC; CANALES, FERNANDO, Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court - Judicial Officer: Shayer, Steven

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketRequest for Court Judgment - Comment: Proposed Court Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT C.C.P. 585(D);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketNon-Military Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: C.C.P. 1033B (1) & (2)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Court Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer(s): Benavides, Jose R., Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: LVNV FUNDING LLC; Served: 01/19/201812:20 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketNon-Military Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.