This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/20/2018 at 18:33:11 (UTC).

LUGO VS LUGO

Case Summary

On 03/25/2016 LUGO filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against LUGO. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Ridgecrest Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Glennon, Donald P., Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0102

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ridgecrest Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LUGO, RUDY

Respondent

LUGO, SHELBY

 

Court Documents

Request for Order - Petitioner

05/04/16 MO: Petitioner's Request for Order: Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Petitioner: LUGO, RUDY; Respondent: LUGO, SHELBY

Ex Parte Hearing

MO-PET EX PARTE REQUEST: Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:15 PM; Result: Held

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2017
  • Findings and Orders - Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Comment: HEARING DATE 5/4/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • Letter Received - Comment: Letter From: RUDY LUGO Date of Letter: 11/21/16 Re:FINDINGS AND ORDERS AFTER HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2016
  • Rejection/Correction Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2016
  • Rejection/Correction Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • Rejection/Correction Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2016
  • No Mediation Agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2016
  • Proof of Personal Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Order - Petitioner - 05/04/16 MO: Petitioner's Request for Order: Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Petitioner: LUGO, RUDY; Respondent: LUGO, SHELBY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2016
  • Subpoenaed Records Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2016
  • Mother Failed to Appear for Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2016
  • Mediation Appointment - Hearing Time: 10:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • Rejection/Correction Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • Request for Order with Court Order (FL-300)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Ex Parte Hearing - MO-PET EX PARTE REQUEST: Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:15 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • Ex Parte Application / Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • Ex Parte Compliance - Comment: Hearing Date: 4/8/2016 Hearing Time: 1:15 PM Hearing Department/Division: BR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2016
  • Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2016
  • Request to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2016
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2016
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.