This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 10/06/2021 at 08:51:29 (UTC).

LPOD, INC. VS SCHNITZER

Case Summary

On 09/29/2020 LPOD, INC filed an Other lawsuit against SCHNITZER. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Clark, Thomas S. and Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2282

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Clark, Thomas S.

Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LPOD, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

PORTER, MICHAEL J

Defendants

BAYVIEW ENVIROMENTAL SERVICES INC.

SCHNITZER STEEL INDUSTRIES, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WEGIS, RALPH B

Defendant Attorneys

MELENDEZ, MICHAEL W

LORAN, THOMAS V., III

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition)

Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition) 07/15/2021: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: RE: SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $250.00 AS TO COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF FOR FAILING TO APPEAR ON 05/04/2021

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Re: Case Management Statement and Proof of Service, duplicate filing

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Case Management Statement; Proof of Service (Envelope Id #6756946) Correct time to 8:30 a.m.

Further Hearing - Pre-Disposition

Case Management Conference 05/04/2021: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Comment: CMC - COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF FTA ON 05/04/2021

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 03/30/2021: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Comment: continued from 03/30/2021

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: as to Notice; Please use mandatory Judicial Council form POS-010. Please resubmit Notice attached behind completed POS-010 and refile as one scanned document.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: as to Proof of Service; Please resubmit POS-010 with Proof of Mailing attached behind it and file as one scanned document.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: First Amended Complaint; Seek leave of Court

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint as to Schnitzer Steel Industries, Inc. Duplicate filing received-As of 10/20/2020. Please note the proof of service as to Bayview Environmental Services, Inc. remains outstanding.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint as to Schnitzer Steel Industries, Inc. Proof as to Schnitze Steel Industries, Inc. has been filed as of 10/20/2020. Proof as to Bayview Environmental Services, Inc. is needed for OSC hearing to be vacated.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Ralph Wegis Re: Summons Reason: Name of Plaintiff does not conform to Complaint. You could use a smaller font to fit the whole name of the Plaintiffs and Defendants on the front of the Summons. Please correct and resubmit. Thank you.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Re: Second Rejection; Summons, Party names listed for Defendant and Plaintiff do not conform to the complaint. Please correct and resubmit.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Ralph Wegis Re: Summons Reason: Please list at least one Defendant and one Plaintiff on the Summons then you can list Additional Parties Form.

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 01/14/2021 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division:17

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Ralph B. Wegis Re: Summons Reason: Incorrect summons atachment, double names in parties.

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketJury Trial - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: estimate 10 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketFinal Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Comment: T/E 10 Days CFM/JT 5-31-22 (D17)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: Copy of 7/16/2021 Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference, Final Case Management Conference, Trial addressed to Michael W. Melendez Melendez & Associates 2950 Buskirk Ave #300, Walnut Creek, CA 94597 On 8/13/2021 address updated in the court system to reflect address noted on the filed Answer to the First Amended Complaint filed 6/14/2021. Notice remailed to Michael W. Melendez Cozen O'Connor 101 Montgomery Street, Ste 1400, San Francisco, CA 94104.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketMinute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition) - Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition) 07/15/2021: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: RE: SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $250.00 AS TO COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF FOR FAILING TO APPEAR ON 05/04/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFurther Hearing - Pre-Disposition - Case Management Conference 05/04/2021: Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition) 07/15/2021: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: CMC - COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF FTA ON 05/04/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Re: Case Management Statement and Proof of Service, duplicate filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: as to Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Schnitzer Steel Industries, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Ralph Wegis Re: Summons Reason: Name of Plaintiff does not conform to Complaint. You could use a smaller font to fit the whole name of the Plaintiffs and Defendants on the front of the Summons. Please correct and resubmit. Thank you.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Re: Second Rejection; Summons, Party names listed for Defendant and Plaintiff do not conform to the complaint. Please correct and resubmit.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 10/13/2020; Served: 12/12/20204:08 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Ralph Wegis Re: Summons Reason: Please list at least one Defendant and one Plaintiff on the Summons then you can list Additional Parties Form.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 01/14/2021 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division:17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Ralph B. Wegis Re: Summons Reason: Incorrect summons atachment, double names in parties.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SCHNITZER STEEL INDUSTRIES, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where LPOD, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where BAYVIEW ENVIROMENTAL SERVICES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WEGIS, RALPH B