This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 20:08:39 (UTC).

LOZANO VS GUERRERO

Case Summary

On 03/21/2016 LOZANO filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against GUERRERO. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Delano / Mcfarland Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Palmer, William D. and Tafoya, Robert S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0081

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delano / Mcfarland Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Palmer, William D.

Tafoya, Robert S.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LOZANO, ANGELICA

Respondent

GUERRERO, JUAN DAMIEN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketRevenue Recovery Document-Agreement to Satisfy Court - Comment: Ordered Fines

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • DocketChild Support Registry Received for Forwarding to SDU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • DocketOrder to Pay Waived Court Fees and Costs - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order Before Hearing; Party: Names: LOZANO, ANGELICA; GUERRERO, JUAN DAMIEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution (Default) - Judicial Officer: Palmer, William D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • DocketDeclaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution (FL-170)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2016
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: Default Judgment Packet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2016
  • DocketNotice of Change Name/Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2016
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • DocketFamily Law Documents - Requested By: LOZANO, ANGELICA; Served: 07/25/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.