This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 22:34:10 (UTC).

LOYA VS BURDETTE

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 LOYA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BURDETTE. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lampe, David R. and Clark, Thomas S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2361

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lampe, David R.

Clark, Thomas S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOYA, MARIA

Defendant

BURDETTE, BEVERLY J.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WHITTINGTON, MARK JOSEPH

Defendant Attorney

LEVIN-BORCOVER, LORI D

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 04/09/2018: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketJury Trial - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: T/E 5-7 DAYS JURY FOR BOTH SIDES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketFinal Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: J/T & FSC SET 5/13/2019 T/E 5-7 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: With Prejudice on Entire Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • DocketMinute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Case Management Conference 04/09/2018: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • DocketNotice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketCase Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • DocketCase Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • DocketNotice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: AS TO BEVERLY J. BURDETTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: AS TO BEVERLY J BURDETTTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA AMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 1/24/2018 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 10/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less