This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/22/2022 at 07:29:34 (UTC).

LOTUS PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, LLC VS CASH ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/03/2021 LOTUS PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CASH. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2624

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOTUS PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendants

CASH, DANIELLE

HAZDOVAC, CORY

CORY HAZDOVAC PRESENTLY KNOWN AS CORY ELLIOT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRAUN, CRAIG D

Defendant Attorneys

MCCORMACK, SANDRA KUHN

BOGIE, DARREN J

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 02/23/2022 Hearing Time: 8:30 am Hearing Department/Division: H

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: re; Proof of Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketNotice of Continuance - Comment: Notice of Continued CMC/Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: Defendant Hazdovac's Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketRuling/Certificate of Inability - Judicial Officer: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.; Comment: *** GRANTED IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that CORY HAZDOVAC shall have to and including January 10, 2021, within which to file a responsive pleading to Plaintiffs Complaint.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Inability to Respond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Danielle Cash, via mail service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: re; Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Cory Hazdovac, via sub service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 12/03/2021; Served: 11/21/20212:36 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 02/23/2022 Hearing Time: 8:30 am Hearing Department/Division: H

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Darren John Bogie

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCCORMACK, SANDRA KUHN