This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 11/28/2021 at 07:34:09 (UTC).

LOS ANGELES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION VS SHIPP

Case Summary

On 06/21/2021 LOS ANGELES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SHIPP. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3430

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOS ANGELES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

Defendant

SHIPP, SHARON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANAYA, ALANA B

 

Court Documents

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21):

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F):

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Court Judgment - Declaration of Art Sookazian is unsigned evidence to support Default Judgment is required.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Request not entered 1a does not conform to the Complaint and Attorney fee's were not requested within the Complaint or prayer.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Court Judgment - Comment: As to Sharon Shipp on complaint filed 6/21/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Request not entered 1a does not conform to the Complaint and Attorney fee's were not requested within the Complaint or prayer.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: Without prejudice as to Does 1-40

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketRequest For Entry of Default Not Entered - Comment: 1a Does not conform to the Complaint; and Attorney fee's were not requested in the Prayer of the Complaint.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Court Judgment - Declaration of Art Sookazian is unsigned evidence to support Default Judgment is required.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketDeclaration and Order - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: Granting copies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: DECLARATION RE ATTORNEYS FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: DECLATATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT 585d (**Unsigned**)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Court Judgment - Comment: As to Sharon Shipp on complaint filed 6/21/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: Without prejudice as to Does 1-40

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Sharon Shipp via certified mail service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 06/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LOS ANGELES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION is a litigant