This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/23/2018 at 07:08:52 (UTC).

LORENZ VS YORK

Case Summary

On 01/31/2017 LORENZ filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against YORK. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Green, Kenneth R., Jr. and Bittleston, Dawn. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0054

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

Bittleston, Dawn

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LORENZ, BRIDGET

Defendant

YORK, SHELLEY

 

Court Documents

Ruling

Ruling 03/13/2017: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Ex Parte Hearing - Post-Disposition

Ex Parte Hearing - Post-Disposition 03/16/2017: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Defendant: YORK, SHELLEY

Ruling

Ruling 04/07/2017: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Unlawful Detainer Trial (Court)

Unlawful Detainer Trial 04/20/17: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Dismissed; Parties Present Plaintiff: LORENZ, BRIDGET; Defendant: YORK, SHELLEY

Ex Parte Hearing - Post-Disposition

Ex Parte Hearing - Post-Disposition 04/06/2017: Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff: LORENZ, BRIDGET; Defendant: YORK, SHELLEY

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2017
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Crt Ordered Dism After Court Trial(CL/CV); Party: Names: LORENZ, BRIDGET; YORK, SHELLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: LORENZ, BRIDGET; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 5884 BACKUS RD MOJAVE CA 93501; Awarded Against: YORK, SHELLEY; Party: Names: LORENZ, BRIDGET; YORK, SHELLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Unlawful Detainer Trial (Court) - Unlawful Detainer Trial 04/20/17: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Dismissed; Parties Present Plaintiff: LORENZ, BRIDGET; Defendant: YORK, SHELLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • Mail Returned Undelivered - Comment: Bridget Lorenz, minute order for 4/7/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • Mail Returned Undelivered - Comment: Bridget Lorenz minute order.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • Confidential Document - Comment: Judge notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Ruling - Ruling 04/07/2017: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Ex Parte Hearing - Post-Disposition - Ex Parte Hearing - Post-Disposition 04/06/2017: Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff: LORENZ, BRIDGET; Defendant: YORK, SHELLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • Ex Parte Hearing - Post-Disposition - Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Plaintiff: LORENZ, BRIDGET

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 02/08/2017
  • Proof of Service of Summons - Comment: SHELLEY YORK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: LORENZ, BRIDGET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • Notice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • Complaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Comment: NEW UD FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Comment: New Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.