This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 07:19:03 (UTC).

LOPEZ VS RAMIREZ RAYA

Case Summary

On 01/03/2020 LOPEZ filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against RAMIREZ RAYA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0020

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LOPEZ, DIANEY PENA

Respondent

RAMIREZ RAYA, REYNA BIBIANA

 

Court Documents

Petition for Harassment

Petition for Harassment 03/04/2020: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: POS DEFECTIVE / TRO GRANTED

Petition for Harassment

Petition for Harassment 02/13/2020: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: POS DEFECTIVE / TRO GRANTED

Petition for Harassment

Petition for Harassment 01/22/2020: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2020
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Other Court-Ordered Dism Before Trial (CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Harassment - Petition for Harassment 03/04/2020: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: POS DEFECTIVE / TRO GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketOrder on Request to Continue Hearing (CH-116) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: 3/4/20 @830am dept 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketRequest to Continue Court Hearing (CH-115) - Comment: By Petitoner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Harassment - Petition for Harassment 02/13/2020: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: POS DEFECTIVE / TRO GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service (CH-200) - Comment: as to Reyna pena Lopez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketOrder on Request to Continue Hearing (CH-116) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: HRG:2/13/20 @830AM DEPT 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketRequest to Continue Court Hearing (CH-115) - Comment: by petitioner.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service (CH-200) - Comment: as to Reyna Bibiana Ramirez Raya

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Harassment - Petition for Harassment 01/22/2020: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketNotice of Court Hearing (CH-109) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: hrg: 1/22/20 @830am dept 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (CH-110) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: 100 yards stay away order granted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Comment: BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: LOPEZ, DIANEY PENA; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketRequest for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders (CH-100)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.