Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/17/2018 at 19:00:34 (UTC).

LOPEZ VS ORTIZ ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/07/2015 LOPEZ filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ORTIZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0887

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOPEZ, MILAGRO

Defendants

ORTIZ, FRANK

ORTIZ, VALERIE MEDRANO

 

Court Documents

Unlawful Detainer Trial (Court)

MO-Unlawful Detainer Trial: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Judgment; Comment: Answer filed by Frank Ortiz and Valerie Medrano Ortiz. Time estimate 30 minutes.; Parties Present Plaintiff: LOPEZ, MILAGRO; Defendant: ORTIZ, FRANK; Defendant: ORTIZ, VALERIE MEDRANO

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Stipulated Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: LOPEZ, MILAGRO; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 1505 TERRACE WAY BAKERSFIELD, CA 93304; Awarded Against: ORTIZ, FRANK; ORTIZ, VALERIE MEDRANO; Party: Names: LOPEZ, MILAGRO; ORTIZ, FRANK; ORTIZ, VALERIE MEDRANO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2015
  • Order to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer(s): Etienne, Linda S., Copelan, James B.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2015
  • Mediation Agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Unlawful Detainer Trial (Court) - MO-Unlawful Detainer Trial: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Judgment; Comment: Answer filed by Frank Ortiz and Valerie Medrano Ortiz. Time estimate 30 minutes.; Parties Present Plaintiff: LOPEZ, MILAGRO; Defendant: ORTIZ, FRANK; Defendant: ORTIZ, VALERIE MEDRANO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • Court Interpreter Services - CV - Comment: Spanish interpreter requested.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • Notice of Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • Request/Counter Request to Set Case for Trial (UD)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Comment: Request to set: Item #2 incomplete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Comment: by Clerk as to Frank Ortiz

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Comment: by Clerk as to Valerie Medrano Ortiz

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/13/2015
  • Request to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • Request to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Comment: Proof of service rejected: Item #2 & #6 incomplete. Please revise.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: LOPEZ, MILAGRO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Notice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Address and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property - Comment: 1505 Terrace Way Bakersfield, CA 93304

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: Returned via counter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Complaint - Unlawful Detainer - Comment: In Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less