Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/09/2021 at 19:14:06 (UTC).

LOPEZ VS LOPEZ ARRIAGA (B)

Case Summary

On 10/14/2020 LOPEZ filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against LOPEZ ARRIAGA B. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Cannon, Gloria. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3375

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Cannon, Gloria

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LOPEZ, ANTONIO M

Respondent

LOPEZ ARRIAGA, ANTONIO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2020
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Lack of Prosecution Before Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence - Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Dropped; Comment: 10/15/20 PET DV/TRO MOVE OUT ALC/DRG CLASSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketNotice of Court Hearing Domestic Violence (DV-109)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order - CLETS (New)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketRequest for DV Restraining Order New No Children

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketCourt Interpreter Services - FL

    Read MoreRead Less