This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/22/2018 at 06:47:11 (UTC).

LOPEZ VS LOPEZ

Case Summary

On 10/20/2016 LOPEZ filed a Family - Legal Separation lawsuit against LOPEZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4616

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Legal Separation

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LOPEZ, JUANITA ESPINOZA

Respondent

LOPEZ, JOE HOLGUIN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • Judgment of Legal Separation (Default) - Judicial Officer: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • Request to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • Declaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution (FL-170)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • Declaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • Proof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Request to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Petition for Legal Separation

    Read MoreRead Less