Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 22:00:13 (UTC).

LOPEZ VS LOPEZ

Case Summary

On 07/09/2015 LOPEZ filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against LOPEZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Schuett, Stephen D., Fielder, John L. and Stainfield, Bryan K.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1670

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Schuett, Stephen D.

Fielder, John L.

Stainfield, Bryan K.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LOPEZ, JOSE

Respondent

LOPEZ, NAIDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

STOKER, IRA L

 

Court Documents

Hearing on Waiver of Fees

Original Type: Hearing on Waiver of Fees; HEARING ON WAIVER OF FEES AS TO NADIA LOPEZ: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: RES FW FEES: $435.00; Parties Present Respondent: LOPEZ, NAIDA

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2019
  • Notice of Change Name/Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • Declaration Re Service of Preliminary/Final Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • Mail Returned Undelivered - Comment: INVOICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2015
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver After Hearing - Denied / Payment - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Comment: Arrangement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2015
  • Revenue Recovery Document-Agreement to Satisfy Court - Comment: Ordered Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Hearing on Waiver of Fees - Original Type: Hearing on Waiver of Fees; HEARING ON WAIVER OF FEES AS TO NADIA LOPEZ: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: RES FW FEES: $435.00; Parties Present Respondent: LOPEZ, NAIDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2015
  • Revenue Recovery Financial Evaluation Recommendation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2015
  • Response

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2015
  • Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Hearing Ordered - Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2015
  • Request to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2015
  • Proof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less