This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/29/2020 at 16:30:49 (UTC).

LOPEZ VS GALVAN

Case Summary

On 03/05/2014 LOPEZ filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against GALVAN. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Delano / Mcfarland Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Tafoya, Robert S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2673

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Tafoya, Robert S.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LOPEZ, MARIA DEL CARMEN

Respondent

GALVAN, EDUARDO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2014
  • DocketOrder to Pay Waived Court Fees and Costs - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2014
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2014
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution (Default) - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2014
  • DocketNP1085 - Comment: Department: BD Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: REVIEW RE: DEFAULT HEARING THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: MARIA DEL CARMEN LOPEZ (PE-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. NO APPEARANCE BY EDUARDO GALVAN (RE-1) THE COURT FINDS AS FOLLOWS: DEFENDANT IS CURRENTLY RECEIVING PUBLIC ASSISTANCE MATTER WILL BE REFFERED TO JUDGE TAFOYA FOR REVIEW THE COURT ORDERS ADJOURNMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2014
  • Docket4004 Default - Comment: Hearing Entered. Calendar Notes: RE: CHILD SUPPORT RESERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2014
  • DocketDefault - Original Type: Default; Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: CONV; Comment: RE: CHILD SUPPORT RESERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2014
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2014
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: NOTICE OF HEARING By order of Judge Robert S. Tafoya, Default Judgment by Declaration is ordered set for Default Hearing. _____________________________________________________________________________________________ To Counsel of record for respective parties: YOU ARE HEREBY NOTIFIED THAT THE HEARING AS HEREIN ABOVE INDICATED IN THE ABOVE ENTITLED MATTER IS SET FOR 6/13/2014 AT 9:00 am IN DIVISION AD, 1122 JEFFERSON ST, DELANO, CA 93215, OF THE SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, COUNTY OF KERN. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF HEARING By order of Judge Robert S. Tafoya, Default Judgment by Declaration is ordered set for Default Hearing. _____________________________________________________________________________________________ To Counsel of record for respective parties: YOU ARE HEREBY NOTIFIED THAT THE HEARING AS HEREIN ABOVE INDICATED IN THE ABOVE ENTITLED MATTER IS SET FOR 6/13/2014 AT 9:00 am IN DIVISION AD, 1122 JEFFERSON ST, DELANO, CA 93215, OF THE SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, COUNTY OF KERN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2014
  • DocketDeclaration for Default - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2014
  • DocketProposed Judgment - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/01/2014
  • DocketIncome and Expense Declaration - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2014
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2014
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Preliminary/Final Disclosure - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2014
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2014
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2014
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2014
  • DocketUCCJEA - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2014
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2014
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2014
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created.

    Read MoreRead Less