This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 20:53:38 (UTC).

LOPEZ VS FASTRIP FOOD STORE

Case Summary

On 04/01/2016 LOPEZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against FASTRIP FOOD STORE. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Chapin, Sidney P., Lampe, David R. and Friedman, Gary T.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0714

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Chapin, Sidney P.

Lampe, David R.

Friedman, Gary T.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOPEZ, MELISSA

Defendants

FASTRIP FOOD STORE

FASTRIP FOOD STORES

COREMARK INTERNATIONAL, INC.

WILBUR CURTIS COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JOHNSON, CRAIG E

HANSEN, JOHNNA J

Defendant Attorneys

COOPER, DAVID J

VASQUEZ, FRED R

PEAKE, LARRY F

 

Court Documents

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 08/11/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: re: case not at issue due to doe amendments - set by DRL; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: HANSEN, JOHNNA J; Defendant; Attorney: PEAKE, LARRY F; Defendant; Attorney: VASQUEZ, FRED R

Ruling

Ruling 08/10/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 11:30 AM; Result: Ruling

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Amendments and order rejected in File & Serve

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Amendments to Complaint (2) rejected in File & Serve

Mandatory Settlement Conference

Mandatory Settlement Conference 07/07/2017: Judicial Officer: Friedman, Gary T.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: JT/FCMC: 08/07/17 IN D-11 9am t/e 4 to 5 days jury both; Parties Present Plaintiff: LOPEZ, MELISSA; Attorney: HANSEN, JOHNNA J

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 10/03/2016: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: JOHNSON, CRAIG E

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Notice of Settlement Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal - Comment: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: With Prejudice on Entire Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • DocketRuling - Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • DocketNotice of Settlement Unconditional

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • DocketNotice of Change Name/Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • DocketRuling/Certificate of Inability - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Comment: EXTENSION GRANTED. Responsive Pleading shall be filed no later than October 8, 2017. ***JUDGE DAVID R. LAMPE***9-12-17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • DocketRuling/Certificate of Inability - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Comment: EXTENSION GRANTED. Responsive Pleading shall be filed no later than October 6, 2017 ***JUDGE DAVID R. LAMPE***9-12-17

    Read MoreRead Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 05/31/2016
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • DocketNotice of Assignment to Judge for All Purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA CRAIG JOHNSON.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • DocketRuling - Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Comment: GRANTED BY JUDGE CHAPIN AS TO MELISSA LOPEZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • DocketPeremptory Challenge-170.6 - Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Comment: Filed by Craig E. Johnson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 7/19/16 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees - Comment: AS TO MELISSA LOPEZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

CRAIG E. JOHNSON, Esq. (SB 140615)

(661) 6311713 telephone mmber (661) 631-1725 fax

316 439 1001 telephone 310 943 2476 fax

Attorneys for Plaintiff MELISSA LOPEZ

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA COUNTY OF KERN

CASE NO: BCV-16-160714 DRL

FASTRIP FOOD STORES etc. et. al. PGRS‘FANTTG CCP.§374 TRIAL DATE: AUGUST 7, 2017 Defendants.

mmmmmmmmmmswm:

Upon filing the complaint herein, plaintiff being ignorant of the true name of a defendant, and having designated said defendant in the complaint by fictitious names, to-wit Doe 1, and having discovered the true names of said defendant to be

WILBUR CURTIS COMPANY, hereby amends her complaint by inserting