This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 19:08:57 (UTC).

LOPEZ VS AYON

Case Summary

On 03/08/2016 LOPEZ filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against AYON. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Delano / Mcfarland Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Tafoya, Robert S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0064

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delano / Mcfarland Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Tafoya, Robert S.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LOPEZ, RAFAEL ALCANTAR

Respondent

AYON, CLAUDIA VEGA

 

Court Documents

Request for Order - Respondent

Request for Order - Respondent 09/01/2017: Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Re: Modify Child Custody & Visitation; Parties Present Respondent: AYON, CLAUDIA VEGA

Request for Order - Petitioner

Original Type: Request for Order - Respondent; Request for Order - Petitioner 05/26/2017: Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Dropped; Parties Present Respondent: AYON, CLAUDIA VEGA

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2017
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • DocketFindings and Orders - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Comment: Hearing of: 09/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order - Respondent - Request for Order - Respondent 09/01/2017: Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Re: Modify Child Custody & Visitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • DocketMediation Appointment - Hearing Time: 9:45 AM; Result: Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • DocketProof of Personal Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • DocketRequest for Order with Court Order (FL-300) - Comment: Re: Modify Child Custody & Visitation Mediation Date: 08/29/2017 Hearing Date: 09/01/2017 Department: A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order - Petitioner - Original Type: Request for Order - Respondent; Request for Order - Petitioner 05/26/2017: Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Dropped

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • DocketMediation Appointment - Hearing Time: 11:15 AM; Result: Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • DocketRequest for Order with Court Order (FL-300) - Comment: Re: Modify Child Custody & Visitation Mediation: 05/23/2017 Hearing Date: 05/26/2017 Hearing Time: 9:00 a.m. Department: A

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 05/19/2016
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution (Default) - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Comment: MARITAL STATUS ENDS: 09/10/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2016
  • DocketDeclaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution (FL-170)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2016
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2016
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Final Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2016
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2016
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • DocketFamily Law Documents - Requested By: LOPEZ, RAFAEL ALCANTAR; Served: 03/09/20168:45 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • DocketAffidavit - Paralegal / Typing Service - Comment: RAMONA'S TYPING SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.