This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 22:51:25 (UTC).

LOPEZ VS ARIAS

Case Summary

On 03/20/2017 LOPEZ filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ARIAS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Delano / Mcfarland Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Tafoya, Robert S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0063

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delano / Mcfarland Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Tafoya, Robert S.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LOPEZ, ELVIA ZEPEDA

Respondent

ARIAS, FRANKLI LOPEZ

 

Court Documents

Default

Default 06/23/2017: Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Petitioner: LOPEZ, ELVIA ZEPEDA

Ruling

Ruling 05/23/2017: Hearing Time: 03:30 PM; Result: Held

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Default

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Comment: MARITAL STATUS ENDS: 09/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order After Hearing; Party: Names: LOPEZ, ELVIA ZEPEDA; ARIAS, FRANKLI LOPEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefault - Default 06/23/2017: Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: Re: Default Hearing Date: 06/23/2017 Hearing Time: 9:00 a.m. Department: A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling 05/23/2017: Hearing Time: 03:30 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • DocketDeclaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution (FL-170)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketFamily Law Documents - Requested By: LOPEZ, ELVIA ZEPEDA; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.