This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 07/07/2020 at 09:08:12 (UTC).

LOPEZ VS ALVARADO

Case Summary

On 03/16/2020 LOPEZ filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ALVARADO. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Shafter / Wasco Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Benavides, Jose R. and Cervantes, Gina. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0008

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Shafter / Wasco Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Benavides, Jose R.

Cervantes, Gina

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LOPEZ, FELISA

LOPEZ

Defendants

ALVARADO, ARMANDO

ALVARADO

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Small Claims Trial

Small Claims Trial 06/05/2020: Judicial Officer: Cervantes, Gina; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

Ruling

03/27/2020 MO:Ruling: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2020
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Cervantes, Gina; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order After Hearing; Judgment - Non-Monetary Award: Awarded To: Awarded Against: Party: Names:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties - Comment: (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketRuling - Judicial Officer: Cervantes, Gina; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketSmall Claims Trial - Judicial Officer: Cervantes, Gina; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketSmall Claims Trial - Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Court's Own Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketRuling - Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less