This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 23:31:27 (UTC).

LOPEZ-GUERRA VS GUERRA(E)

Case Summary

On 03/28/2017 LOPEZ-GUERRA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against GUERRA E. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Fielder, John L., Loo, Cynthia L., Stainfield, Bryan K., McKnight, Ralph L., Jr., Bittleston, Dawn and Foley, Therese M.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1884

  • Filing Date:

    03/28/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Fielder, John L.

Loo, Cynthia L.

Stainfield, Bryan K.

McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.

Bittleston, Dawn

Foley, Therese M.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LOPEZ-GUERRA, ERIKA

Respondent

GUERRA, CHRISTIAN

Minor

COUNSEL, MINOR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

GORSKI, VINCENT A

GORSKI, VINCENT A.

Respondent Attorney

SWANSON, JEREMY D

Minor Attorney

HART, CARL W, Jr.

 

Court Documents

Family Centered Case Resolution

Family Centered Case Resolution 07/25/2019: Judicial Officer: Foley, Therese M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 5/10/19 NOTICE OF FCCR HRG 2 MINORS CONTD FROM 6/19/19

Family Centered Case Resolution

Family Centered Case Resolution 06/19/2019: Judicial Officer: Foley, Therese M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 5/10/19 NOTICE OF FCCR HRG 2 MINORS

Family Centered Case Resolution

Family Centered Case Resolution 10/24/2018: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Judgment; Comment: 05/16/18 NOTICE OF HRG FCCR CONTD FROM 7/20/18 8/3/18 9/6/18; Parties Present Petitioner: LOPEZ-GUERRA, ERIKA; Attorney: GORSKI, VINCENT A.; Respondent: GUERRA, CHRISTIAN; Attorney: SWANSON, JEREMY D

Family Centered Case Resolution

Family Centered Case Resolution 09/06/2018: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 05/16/18 NOTICE OF HRG FCCR CONTD FROM 7/20/18 8/3/18; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: GORSKI, VINCENT A.; Respondent; Attorney: SWANSON, JEREMY D

Family Centered Case Resolution

Family Centered Case Resolution 08/03/2018: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 05/16/18 NOTICE OF HRG FCCR CONT'D FROM 7/20/18; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: GORSKI, VINCENT A.; Respondent; Attorney: SWANSON, JEREMY D

Family Centered Case Resolution

Original Type: Family Centered Case Resolution; Family Centered Case Resolution 07/20/2018: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 05/16/18 NOTICE OF HRG FCCR 2 MINORS; Parties Present Respondent; Attorney: SWANSON, JEREMY D

Request for Order - Respondent

Request for Order - Petitioner 02/15/2018: Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 10/23/17 RES COMPEL RESPONSES SANCTIONS 2 MINORS CONT'D FROM 2/7/18 *TO BE HEARD AT 10AM*; Parties Present Respondent; Attorney: SWANSON, JEREMY D

Request for Order - Respondent

Request for Order - Petitioner 04/26/2018: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held; Comment: 10/23/17 RES COMPEL RESPONSES SANCTIONS 2 MINORS CONT'D FROM 2/15/18; Parties Present Petitioner: LOPEZ-GUERRA, ERIKA; Attorney: GORSKI, VINCENT A.; Respondent: GUERRA, CHRISTIAN; Attorney: SWANSON, JEREMY D

Request for Order - Respondent

Request for Order - Petitioner 02/07/2018: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 10/23/17 RES COMPEL RESPONSES SANCTIONS 2 MINORS CONT'D FROM 1/31/18; Parties Present Petitioner: LOPEZ-GUERRA, ERIKA; Attorney: GORSKI, VINCENT A; Respondent: GUERRA, CHRISTIAN; Attorney: SWANSON, JEREMY D; Minor Party; Court Appointed: HART, CARL W, Jr.

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketFamily Centered Case Resolution - Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Dropped; Comment: 5/10/19 NOTICE OF FCCR HRG 2 MINORS CONTD FROM 6/19/19 7/25/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFamily Centered Case Resolution - Family Centered Case Resolution 07/25/2019: Judicial Officer: Foley, Therese M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 5/10/19 NOTICE OF FCCR HRG 2 MINORS CONTD FROM 6/19/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFamily Centered Case Resolution - Family Centered Case Resolution 06/19/2019: Judicial Officer: Foley, Therese M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 5/10/19 NOTICE OF FCCR HRG 2 MINORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: NOTICE OF HEARING RE: FAMILY CENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: FOR FCCR HRG HRG 6/19/19 DIV. E **HEARING TO BE VACATED IF FORMAL JUDGMENT IS COMPLETED PRIOR TO HEARING DATE.**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • DocketExhibit(s) List - Comment: RESPONDENT'S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order After Court Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • DocketDissomaster Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFamily Centered Case Resolution - Family Centered Case Resolution 10/24/2018: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Judgment; Comment: 05/16/18 NOTICE OF HRG FCCR CONTD FROM 7/20/18 8/3/18 9/6/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFamily Centered Case Resolution - Family Centered Case Resolution 09/06/2018: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 05/16/18 NOTICE OF HRG FCCR CONTD FROM 7/20/18 8/3/18

    Read MoreRead Less
59 More Docket Entries
  • 04/24/2017
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver After Hearing - Granted In Whole - Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing on Waiver of Fees - Hearing on Waiver of Fees 04/21/2017: Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET FW FEES: $580.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • DocketRevenue Recovery Financial Evaluation Recommendation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • DocketRequest for Order with Court Order (FL-300) - Comment: HRG 05/02/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • DocketEx Parte Compliance - Comment: OST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Hearing Ordered - Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.; Comment: HRG 4/21/17 DIV C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COUNSEL, MINOR is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HART, CARL W, Jr.