This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 07:55:39 (UTC).

LONG VS LONGBOTTOM

Case Summary

On 07/10/2017 LONG filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against LONGBOTTOM. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Ridgecrest Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Glennon, Donald P., Jr. and Webster, Jason W.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0224

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ridgecrest Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

Webster, Jason W.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LONG, LINDA MARIE

Respondent

LONGBOTTOM, BRIAN JOSEPH

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order Before Hearing; Party: Names: LONG, LINDA MARIE; LONGBOTTOM, BRIAN JOSEPH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution (Default) - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Comment: STATUS DATE 4/24/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketDeclaration for Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketAppearance Stipulation and Waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketAffidavit - Paralegal / Typing Service - Comment: CNL LEGAL DOC PREP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • DocketAffidavit - Paralegal / Typing Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • DocketNotice of Change Name/Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • DocketAmended Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • DocketAmended Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less