This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 22:36:10 (UTC).

LOIS A GUNSTEN DECEASED

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 LOIS A GUNSTEN DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Knight, Alisa R., Myers, Brett and Kendall, Andrew. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2980

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Knight, Alisa R.

Myers, Brett

Kendall, Andrew

 

Party Details

Petitioner

RUOSS, LU ANN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BOYLE, STEPHEN H

 

Court Documents

Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting

Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting 03/13/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING First and final account and report of executor and petition for ordinary fees to the attorney, and for final distribution

Petition for Probate of Will

Petition for Probate of Will 03/09/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: BOYLE, STEPHEN H

Petition for Probate of Will

Petition for Probate of Will 01/19/2018: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: BOYLE, STEPHEN H

Petition for Probate of Will

Petition for Probate of Will 11/16/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - NOTES- 1. Notice of petition filed 11/07/17 indicates service to Attorney James R. Hulsey is short. Service was only 9 days and should be 15 days before the hearing. 2. Need copy of trust filed or lodged in this case.; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: BOYLE, STEPHEN H

Ruling

Ruling 10/16/2017: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling; Comment: RULING ON PETITION FOR LETTERS OF SPECIAL ADMINISTRATION

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2019
  • DocketFinal Distribution on Waiver of Accounting - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Comment: Order on first and final account and report of executor and petition for ordinary fees to attorney, and for final distribution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • DocketCompliance Hearing - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Cancel Reason: In Compliance; Comment: re: either a report of status of administrator pursuant to PC 12200 et seq. or petition to close estate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinal Distribution/Waiver of Accounting - Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting 03/13/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING First and final account and report of executor and petition for ordinary fees to the attorney, and for final distribution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: 03/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • DocketFinal Account and Report and Petition for Distribution - Comment: First and final account and report of executor and petition for ordinary fees to the attorney, and for final distribution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • DocketLetters Testamentary

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • DocketOrder For Probate - Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • DocketWill Admitted - Comment: Lost Will dated 10-25-2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Probate of Will - Petition for Probate of Will 03/09/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Probate of Will - Petition for Probate of Will 01/19/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 11/07/2017
  • DocketNotice of Petition to Administer Estate - Comment: 11/16/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2017
  • DocketOrder Appointing Special Administrator - Judicial Officer: Myers, Brett; Comment: Order Appointing Special Administrator Lu Ann Ruoss

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • DocketProof of Publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • DocketAmended Petition - Comment: Amended Petition for Letters of Special Administration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • DocketNotice of Petition to Administer Estate - Comment: 11/16/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling 10/16/2017: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling; Comment: RULING ON PETITION FOR LETTERS OF SPECIAL ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketPetition for Letters of Special Administration - Comment: Petition for Letters of Special Administration Lu Ann Ruoss

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketConfidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities of - Comment: Personal Representative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities of Personal Representative - Comment: Duties and Liabilities

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketPetition for Probate - Comment: Petition for Probate of Lost Will and for Letters Testamentary Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act with Full Authority

    Read MoreRead Less